This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2021 at 09:23:48 (UTC).

Barraza v. Liberty Utilities Co.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Barraza filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Liberty Utilities Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah Barnes and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00163

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Brooks

Joel Erickson

Brianna Morris

Teresa Underwood

Lauren Cantu

Cody Brooks

William Knowles

Cynthia Sneed

Alicia Vernon

John Davis

Christian Davis

Marilyn Barraza

Frank Shoshone

Jody Lees

Steve Vernon

Maria Barraza

Melinda Redrobe

Sandra Dimaggio

Patti Hamic-Christensen

Defendant

Liberty Utilities Co.

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerald Blaine Singleton

Attorney at Singleton Law Firm, APC

450 A Street, 5Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Krsto Mijanovic

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel, LLP

500 Capitol Mall, Suite 2150

Sacramento, CA 95814

Steven Andrew Scordalakis

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

500 Capitol Mall, Suite 2150

Sacramento, CA 95814

Lisa Tamiko Omoto

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

555 South Flower St., 45Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

11 #11

Exhibit H

11 #10

Exhibit G

11 #9

Exhibit F

11 #8

Exhibit E

11 #7

Exhibit D

11 #6

Exhibit C

11 #5

Exhibit B

11 #4

Exhibit A

11 #3

Index of Exhibits

11 #2

Declaration of Eliot Jones

11 #1

Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic

#11

9 #5

Exhibit C

9 #4

Exhibit B

9 #3

Exhibit A

9 #2

Declaration of J. Ross Peabody in Support of Motions to: 1) Dismiss the Complai

9 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions to:

#9

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) OPPOSITION by Liberty Utilities Co. to #9 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #2 Declaration of Eliot Jones, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H)(Mijanovic, Krsto) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/26/21 RELATING this case with cases 2:21-CV-00179 TLN-JDP, 2:21-CV-00180 MCE-DB. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to REMAND by Maria Barraza, et al., Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of J. Ross Peabody, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Singleton, Gerald) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:21-cv-00180-MCE-DB, 2:21-cv-00179-TLN-JDP by Liberty Utilities Co.. (Scordalakis, Steven) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Plaintiffs. (Singleton, Gerald) Modified on 2/17/2021 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lisa Tamiko Omoto on behalf of Liberty Utilities Co.. Attorney Omoto, Lisa Tamiko added. (Omoto, Lisa) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Steven Andrew Scordalakis on behalf of Liberty Utilities Co.. Attorney Scordalakis, Steven Andrew added. (Scordalakis, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Order by Liberty Utilities Co. (Mijanovic, Krsto) Modified on 2/2/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from El Dorado County Superior Court, case number PC20200632 by Liberty Utilities Co. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9384702) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Tamiko Omoto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krsto Mijanovic