This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2021 at 08:11:40 (UTC).

Barraza v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Barraza filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy J. Corrigan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00636

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria M Barraza

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura J. Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1230

Dallas, TX 75219

Russell W. Budd

Attorney at Baron & Budd, PC

Suite 1100, 3102 Oak Lawn Ave.

Dallas, TX 75219

Sindhu Daniel

Attorney at Baron & Budd, PC

Suite 1100, 3102 Oak Lawn Ave.

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorney

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

201 17Th St Nw Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER with directions to the Clerk to open and dismiss with prejudice certain cases pursuant to parties' Joint Stipulations of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/25/2021. (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC)(LRB) Modified on 6/28/2021 to edit text (LRB). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#7

(#7) JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Maria Barraza. (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC) (LRB) Modified on 6/28/2021 to note: incorrect USDC Arizona case number listed. Correct USDC Arizona number is 2:18-cv-3098)(LRB). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions, no later than June 18, 2021. Defendant's counsel is responsible to ensure that the responses are docketed in CM/ECF in this miscellaneous case as directed. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 5/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Final Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - List of Cases)(LRB) (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correct text. (LRB). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-03098. File received electronically (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#4

(#4) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 6/28/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#3

(#3) *AMENDED by Doc. #4--FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from azd on 6/28/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16021852 filed by Maria M Barraza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 6/28/2021.] (Entered: 10/01/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER with directions to the Clerk to open and dismiss with prejudice certain cases pursuant to parties' Joint Stipulations of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/25/2021. (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC)(LRB) Modified on 6/28/2021 to edit text (LRB). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Maria Barraza. (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC) (LRB) Modified on 6/28/2021 to note: incorrect USDC Arizona case number listed. Correct USDC Arizona number is 2:18-cv-3098)(LRB). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions, no later than June 18, 2021. Defendant's counsel is responsible to ensure that the responses are docketed in CM/ECF in this miscellaneous case as directed. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 5/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Final Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - List of Cases)(LRB) (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correct text. (LRB). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-03098. File received electronically (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Florida via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 6/28/2021.] (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 6/28/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *AMENDED by Doc. #4--FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from azd on 6/28/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-03098-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 6/28/2021.] (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16021852 filed by Maria M Barraza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 6/28/2021.] (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant