This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2019 at 07:21:33 (UTC).

BARONE v. 3M COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 BARONE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II, ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY, M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02459

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

T KENT WETHERELL II

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judges

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT BARONE

Defendants

AEARO HOLDINGS, LLC,

AEARO, LLC

AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC,

3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY, LLC

3M COMPANY

Aearo Intermediate, LLC

AEARO HOLDING LLC

AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC

AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC

AEARO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL J JONES

Attorney at BIGHORN LAW LLC - LAS VEGAS NV

716 S Jones Boulevard

Las Vegas, NV 89107

KEELY ANN PERDUE

Attorney at CHRISTIANSEN LAW OFFICES - LAS VEGAS NV

810 S Casino Center Boulevard

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#5

#4

3 #5

AEARO TECHNOLOGIES

3 #4

AEARO LLC

3 #3

AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC

3 #2

AEARO HOLDINGS LLC

3 #1

3M OCCUPATIONAL

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY

1 #6

Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY

1 #5

Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY

1 #4

Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY

1 #3

Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY

1 #2

Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Withdraw Kimball Jones, Esq. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/8/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Withdraw Kimball Jones, Esq. (djb) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Withdraw Kimball Jones, Esq. by ROBERT BARONE. (JONES, KIMBALL) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, #2 AEARO HOLDINGS LLC, #3 AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, #4 AEARO LLC, #5 AEARO TECHNOLOGIES) (sdw) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by KEELY ANN PERDUE on behalf of ROBERT BARONE (PERDUE, KEELY) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case. (lsd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4564663.), filed by ROBERT BARONE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY, #3 Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY, #4 Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY, #5 Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY, #6 Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY, #7 Exhibit SUMMONS- 3M COMPANY) (JONES, KIMBALL) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEARO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC is a litigant