This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2019 at 07:49:59 (UTC).

Barnhouse et al v. Malvern Trust and Savings Bank et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Barnhouse filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Malvern Trust and Savings Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald W. Molloy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald W. Molloy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Angela Previte

Glen Barnhouse

Defendants

John Nicholson

Jay Burdic

Malvern Trust and Savings Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kris McLean

Attorney at Kris A. McLean Law Firm, PLLC

Po Box 1136

Florence, MT 59833

Tyson A. McLean

Attorney at KRIS MCLEAN LAW FIRM, PLLC

315 W. Pine Street

Missoula, MT 59802

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Glen Barnhouse. Malvern Trust and Savings Bank waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (McLean, Kris) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Glen Barnhouse. Jay Burdic waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (McLean, Kris) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Originals mailed to Plaintiffs' counsel.) (NOS) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jay Burdic, Malvern Trust and Savings Bank, John Nicholson filed by Glen Barnhouse, Angela Previte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Glen Barnhouse. Malvern Trust and Savings Bank waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (McLean, Kris) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Glen Barnhouse. Jay Burdic waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (McLean, Kris) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number MTX900013802. (NOS) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Originals mailed to Plaintiffs' counsel.) (NOS) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jay Burdic, Malvern Trust and Savings Bank, John Nicholson filed by Glen Barnhouse, Angela Previte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.