This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 09:56:15 (UTC).

Barnhill v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 Barnhill filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian C. Buescher and Susan M. Bazis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00182

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Buescher

Referral Judge

Susan M. Bazis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carolyn Barnhill

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew N. Faes

Attorney at WAGSTAFF, CARTMELL LAW FIRM

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Jeffrey M. Kuntz

Attorney at WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL

Suite 300, 4740 Grand Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64112

Thomas P. Cartmell

Attorney at WAGSTAFF, CARTMELL LAW FIRM

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

David C. DeGreeff

Attorney at WAGSTAFF, CARTMELL LAW FIRM

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

James H. Keale

Attorney at TANENBAUM KEALE

Three Gateway Center, Suite 1301, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Michael Bonasso

Attorney at FLAHERTY SENSABAUGH & BONASSO

P. O. Box 3843

Charleston, WV 25338-3843

Jon A. Strongman

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY LAW FIRM - KANSAS CITY

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Eric M. Anielak

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Michael A. Tanenbaum

Attorney at TANENBAUM KEALE

Three Gateway Center, Suite 1301, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Scholastica Baker

Attorney at FAEGRE, DRINKER LAW FIRM - MINNESOTA

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

Daniel L. Willis

Attorney at CASSEM, TIERNEY LAW FIRM

9290 West Dodge Road, Suite 302

Omaha, NE 68114-3320

Wendy Wildung

Attorney at FAEGRE, DRINKER LAW FIRM - MINNESOTA

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

David A. Blagg

Attorney at CASSEM, TIERNEY LAW FIRM

9290 West Dodge Road, Suite 302

Omaha, NE 68114-3320

Mark J. Winebrenner

Attorney at FAEGRE, DRINKER LAW FIRM - MINNEAPOLIS

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 2200, Norwest Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Ronald F. Krause

Attorney at CASSEM, TIERNEY LAW FIRM

9290 West Dodge Road, Suite 302

Omaha, NE 68114-3320

 

Court Documents

#81

#76

#75

#74

#71

#70

#69

#68

#66

#65

#64

#62

#61

#60

#59

#58

#57

#56

179 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Attorney David C. DeGreeff on behalf of Plaintiff Carolyn Barnhill (DeGreeff, David) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) TEXT ORDER regarding Pro Hac Vice admission fee #69 in the amount of $100.00 is refunded to the payor, Andrew N. Faes, receipt number ANEDC-4167120. Mr. Faes was previously admitted full-time, therefore, the pro hac vice admission fee is being refunded. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #76 for attorney Wendy Wildung. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #75 for attorney Mark J. Winebrenner. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #74 for attorney Scholastica Baker. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4168345 by Attorney Wendy Wildung on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.(Wildung, Wendy) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4168299 by Attorney Mark J. Winebrenner on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.(Winebrenner, Mark) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4168274 by Attorney Scholastica Baker on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.(Baker, Scholastica) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) TEXT ORDER granting #71 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Thomas P. Cartmell and Jeffrey M. Kuntz are terminated as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #69 for attorney Andrew N. Faes. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2326 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2326 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases on inactive docket) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.] (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Boston Scientific Corporation have reached a settlement. The court ORDERS as follows: All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to place this case on the pending inactive docket. Plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties show good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 6384 in MDL Case No. 2326 Boston. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.] (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Carolyn Barnhill. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 9/11/2013. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 8/13/2013, answer due 10/15/2013. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.] (Entered: 09/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 51 (Order re: Bellwether Case Selection) entered on 08/07/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.] (Entered: 08/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2602842. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.] (Entered: 08/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew N. Faes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. DeGreeff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY M. KUNTZ