This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:13:27 (UTC).

Barnfield v. Kendall

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Barnfield filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kendall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa A. Jensen and Joan H. Lefkow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-50323

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisa A. Jensen

Presiding Judge

Joan H. Lefkow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vanessa Barnfield

Defendant

Jane L Kendall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Philip Justen

Attorney at The Law Office of Kevin P. Justen, P.C.

413 N. Front Street

Mchenry, IL 60050

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: In light of the case dismissal #9 , the initial status hearing set for 2/06/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (jk, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #8 , this case is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanessa Barnfield as to Jane L Kendall on 12/7/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#6

(#6) Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: An initial status hearing is set for 2/06/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 1/30/2020. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Mailed notice (jk, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The general referral of cases to the designated magistrate judge is modified as follows: Unless otherwise specifically ordered, all non-case-dispositive matters within the scope Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a), save the final pretrial conference, shall be noticed before the magistrate judge. All case-dispositive motions, and any other motion for which a report and recommendation would be required by Rule 72(b)(1), shall be noticed before the district judge. Unless the parties consent to disposition of the case by the magistrate judge as provided in Rule 73, final pretrial conferences will be held by the district judge and trial will be before the district judge. Trial dates will be set by the district judge and trials will be conducted in the Roszkowski U.S. Courthouse. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vanessa Barnfield by Kevin Philip Justen (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Vanessa Barnfield; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16497019.(Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: In light of the case dismissal #9 , the initial status hearing set for 2/06/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (jk, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #8 , this case is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanessa Barnfield as to Jane L Kendall on 12/7/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: An initial status hearing is set for 2/06/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 1/30/2020. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Mailed notice (jk, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The general referral of cases to the designated magistrate judge is modified as follows: Unless otherwise specifically ordered, all non-case-dispositive matters within the scope Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a), save the final pretrial conference, shall be noticed before the magistrate judge. All case-dispositive motions, and any other motion for which a report and recommendation would be required by Rule 72(b)(1), shall be noticed before the district judge. Unless the parties consent to disposition of the case by the magistrate judge as provided in Rule 73, final pretrial conferences will be held by the district judge and trial will be before the district judge. Trial dates will be set by the district judge and trials will be conducted in the Roszkowski U.S. Courthouse. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jane L Kendall (jg, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vanessa Barnfield by Kevin Philip Justen (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Vanessa Barnfield; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16497019.(Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.