This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2023 at 08:29:24 (UTC).

Barnette v. Unilever United States, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 Barnette filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Unilever United States, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria E. Garcia and Michael P. Shea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01649

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria E. Garcia

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Billie Barnette

Defendant

Unilever United States, Inc.

Intervenors

Yvonne Barnes

Patricia Dean

Antonio Morris

Bernadette Bogdanovs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Reginald Simpson

Lauren R. Greenspoon

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren R. Greenspoon on behalf of Unilever United States, Inc. (Greenspoon, Lauren) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

26 #1

Exhibit [16] Little - Joint Status Report 11.28.22

26 #26

Main Document

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Related Case by Unilever United States, Inc. (Simpson, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#24

(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unilever United States, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Unilever PLC for Unilever United States, Inc.. (Simpson, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Reginald Simpson on behalf of Unilever United States, Inc. (Simpson, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#22

(#22) Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 12/28/2022. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

15 #1

*Restricted*

15 #15

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#14

No Description Available

13 #8

Exhibit F - Barnes Transfer Denial

13 #7

Exhibit G - Little Stay

13 #6

Exhibit F - Valisure Email & Proposed Agreement

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER. In light of the joint status report (ECF No. 19) filed in related case Little et al v. Unilever United States, Inc., Dkt. No. 22-cv-1189 (MPS), this case is hereby STAYED for 90 days, i.e., until May 4, 2023. As the case has already been transferred to this Court, the parties' #26 joint motion for transfer is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/3/2023. (Davis, Christina) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Docket(#28) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/12/2023.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren R. Greenspoon on behalf of Unilever United States, Inc. (Greenspoon, Lauren) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge by Unilever United States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 Little - Joint Status Report 11.28.22)(Simpson, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Related Case by Unilever United States, Inc. (Simpson, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unilever United States, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Unilever PLC for Unilever United States, Inc.. (Simpson, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Reginald Simpson on behalf of Unilever United States, Inc. (Simpson, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 12/28/2022. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 12/28/2022. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 12/28/2022. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Agreed MOTION to Transfer by Unilever United States, Inc.. (Rogers, Daniel) Modified on 12/2/2022 to edit text (TPL). (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Unilever United States, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Unilever, PLC for Unilever United States, Inc... (Rogers, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER of service returned executed on 11/28/2022 by Billie Barnette as to All Defendants. (Desanto, Mark) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Unilever United States, Inc. (TPL) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Billie Barnette. (Desanto, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel Joseph Sauder of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:22-cv-1236-HES-JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Blaise Desanto on behalf of Billie Barnette (Desanto, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Billie Barnette against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20184970) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Desanto, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less