This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2019 at 07:26:06 (UTC).

Barnett v. U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 Barnett filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against U S Department of Education Default Resolution Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kent J. Dawson and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01542

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kent J. Dawson

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cory Barnett

Pahrump, NV 89048

Defendant

U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brian W. Irvin

Attorney at U.S. Attorney

501 Las Vegas Blvd. So., Ste 1100

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) STATUS REPORT by Defendant U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group. (Irvin, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit Minute Order

#3

(#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Minute Order)(Irvin, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/4/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/19/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Justice Court Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Las Vegas Justice Court, Case Number 19A002692, by U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Justice Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Irvin, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATUS REPORT by Defendant U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group. (Irvin, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Minute Order)(Irvin, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/4/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/19/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Las Vegas Justice Court, Case Number 19A002692, by U.S. Department of Education Default Resolution Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Justice Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Irvin, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.