This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 08:59:27 (UTC).

Barnett v. Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Barnett filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephan M. Vidmar, Gregory J. Fouratt and William P. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00195

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

Presiding Judges

Stephan M. Vidmar

William P. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George Barnett

Defendants

Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc.

Nabors Industries, Inc.

Nabors Corporate Services, Inc.

Nabors Drilling International, Limited

Nabors Industries LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew S. Yezierski

Attorney at McDonald Worley, P.C.

1770 St. James Place, Ste 100

Houston, TX 77056

Gabriel Assaad

Attorney at McDonald Worley

1770 St. James Place, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Julie Sakura

Attorney at Hinkle Hensley Shanor & Martin LLP

218 Montezuma Ave.

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Thomas M. Hnasko

Attorney at Hinkle Hensley Shanor & Martin LLP

Po Box 2068

Santa Fe, NM 87504

James M Cleary

Attorney at Martin, Disiere, Jefferson & Wisdom LLP

808 Travis Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Dioscoro Blanco

Attorney at Hinkle Shanor LLP

218 Montezuma Ave.

Santa Fe, NM 87501

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#5

#6

#9

#10

#11

#15

#16

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss by Nabors Corporate Services, Inc., Nabors Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cleary, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Nabors Corporate Services, Inc., Nabors Industries, Inc.. (Cleary, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, by Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc..(Cleary, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#14) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by George Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Plaintiff - George Barnett) (Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. adding Nabors Drilling International, Limited and Nabors Industries LTD., Nabors Industries LTD. and Nabors Drilling International, Limited., filed by George Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form)(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Joint Status Report due by 5/17/2021. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 2:00 p.m. MDT before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (nmh) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Nabors Corporate Services, Inc., Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc., Nabors Industries, Inc. of Association with Outside Counsel and Certificate of Good Standing (Sakura, Julie) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nabors Corporate Services, Inc., Nabors Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Sakura, Julie) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#7) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Nabors Corporate Services, Inc., Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc., Nabors Industries, Inc. by Julie Sakura on behalf of: James M. Cleary Jr. Martin, Disiere, Jefferson & Wisdom, LLP 808 Travis, Suite 1100Houston, Texas 77002 713-632-1700 Fax 713-222-0101 cleary@mdjwlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sakura, Julie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by George Barnett.(Sakura, Julie) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Barnett. Nabors Industries, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Barnett. Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Barnett. All Defendants. (Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Nabors Corporate Services, Inc., Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc., Nabors Industries, Inc.. (jg) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7573977 re #1 Complaint filed by George Barnett (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by George Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nabors Drilling U S A L P is a litigant

Latest cases where NABORS CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nabors Industries Ltd is a litigant