This case was last updated from PACER on 07/02/2021 at 07:59:22 (UTC).

Barnett et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Barnett filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00128

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nancy Barnett

Mark Gardner

Defendants

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Daniel Stone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Davis A. Whitfield-Cargile

Attorney at Attorney Davis Whitfield-Cargile

P.O. Box 1101

Brevard, NC 28712

Defendant Attorneys

Shelley Walters Coleman

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP

6752 Rock Spring Road, Suite 310

Wilmington, NC 28405

J. Scott Lewis

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP

6752 Rock Spring Road, Suite 310

Wilmington, NC 28405

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Letter from the Clerk of U.S. District Court to the Clerk of Polk County re: Remand of this Case Back to State Court. (kby) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF REMAND granting parties' #7 Joint Motion to Remand and this action is hereby REMANDED to the Polk County General Court of Justice, Superior Court Division. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/1/2021. (kby) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 Joint MOTION to Remand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Coleman, Shelley) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION to Remand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Responses due by 6/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coleman, Shelley) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER that the #5 Consent MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1 Requirements is GRANTED and the deadline for the parties to submit a Certificate of Initial Attorneys' Conference is TEMPORARILY STAYED. On or before June 7, 2021: Plaintiffs shall file the motion to remand referenced in the Motion. In the alternative, the parties shall file a Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 5/28/2021. (kby) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1 Requirements by Nancy Barnett, Mark Gardner. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Whitfield-Cargile, Davis). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley Walters Coleman on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Coleman, Shelley) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Scott Lewis on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Barnett, et al. filed pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Polk County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 169. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5012574), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Barnett, et al. filed pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Lewis, J.) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from the Clerk of U.S. District Court to the Clerk of Polk County re: Remand of this Case Back to State Court. (kby) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF REMAND granting parties' #7 Joint Motion to Remand and this action is hereby REMANDED to the Polk County General Court of Justice, Superior Court Division. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/1/2021. (kby) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 Joint MOTION to Remand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Coleman, Shelley) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION to Remand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Responses due by 6/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coleman, Shelley) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that the #5 Consent MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1 Requirements is GRANTED and the deadline for the parties to submit a Certificate of Initial Attorneys' Conference is TEMPORARILY STAYED. On or before June 7, 2021: Plaintiffs shall file the motion to remand referenced in the Motion. In the alternative, the parties shall file a Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 5/28/2021. (kby) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1 Requirements by Nancy Barnett, Mark Gardner. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Whitfield-Cargile, Davis). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 5/24/2021. (hms) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley Walters Coleman on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Coleman, Shelley) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Scott Lewis on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Polk County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 169. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5012574), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Barnett, et al. filed pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Lewis, J.) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelley Walters Coleman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason S. Lewis