This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:53:13 (UTC).

BARNETT et al v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 BARNETT filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against ABBOTT LABORATORIES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-19665

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Leona Barnett

MICHAEL BARNETT

Defendants

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.

PFIZER, INC.

NOVARTIS INSTITUTES FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, INC

NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATON

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED

NOVARTIS CORPORATION

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN MICHAEL RESTAINO, JR.

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller

5790 Fleet Street, Suite 200

Carlsbad, CA 92008

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/10/19. (jl, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC.. (MCCONNELL, STEPHEN) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION AND TEXT ORDER of DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/5/19. (jl, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Specific Defendants by LEONA BARNETT, MICHAEL BARNETT (RESTAINO, JOHN) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 10/31/19, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II). (jc, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketFor all Case Management Orders #click here (jc, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHARE LP, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) IP LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC, NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC., NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVARTIS INSTITUTES FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, INC, NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATON, NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC., PFIZER, INC., TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH &DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACETICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TAP PHARMACEUTIAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC., WYETH AYERST LABORATIORIES, WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTIALS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10077809) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Leona Barnett, MICHAEL BARNETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RESTAINO, JOHN) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOVARTIS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. is a litigant