This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2022 at 07:41:23 (UTC).

BARNES v. TOBY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 BARNES filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against TOBY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES H WEIGLE and MARC T TREADWELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES H WEIGLE

Presiding Judge

MARC T TREADWELL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DONALD GENE BARNES

Sparta, GA 31087

Respondents

UNNAMED WARDEN

WARDEN ANNETTIA TOBY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

MATTHEW BLACKWELL CROWDER

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF LAW - 03

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

PAULA K SMITH

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF LAW 03

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Filing a Copy of the Letter sent to the Georgia Department of Corrections Office of Professional Standards Regarding Disciplinary Report #907681 by DONALD GENE BARNES (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

9 #2

Envelope

9 #1

Cover Letter

#9

(#9) AMENDED #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, against ANNETTIA TOBY by DONALD GENE BARNES (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MATTHEW BLACKWELL CROWDER on behalf of ANNETTIA TOBY Attorney MATTHEW BLACKWELL CROWDER added to party ANNETTIA TOBY(pty:res)(CROWDER, MATTHEW) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of ANNETTIA TOBY Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party ANNETTIA TOBY(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

1 #10

Memorandum in Support

1 #9

Envelope

1 #8

Exhibit H- Habeas Relief Requested

1 #7

Exhibit G- Ground Exorbitant Post Conviction Delays Unconstitutional

1 #6

Exhibit F- Affidavit of Jakari Daniel

1 #5

Exhibit E- Superior Court of Baldwin County Final Order

1 #4

Exhibit D- Grounds Raised on State Habeas Corpus

1 #3

Exhibit C- Grounds Raised on Direct Appeal

1 #2

Exhibit B- Court of Appeals Order

1 #1

Exhibit A-Grounds Raised on Motion for New Trial

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by DONALD GENE BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Grounds Raised on Motion for New Trial, #2 Exhibit B- Court of Appeals Order, #3 Exhibit C- Grounds Raised on Direct Appeal, #4 Exhibit D- Grounds Raised on State Habeas Corpus, #5 Exhibit E- Superior Court of Baldwin County Final Order, #6 Exhibit F- Affidavit of Jakari Daniel, #7 Exhibit G- Ground Exorbitant Post Conviction Delays Unconstitutional, #8 Exhibit H- Habeas Relief Requested, #9 Envelope)(tam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2022: #10 Memorandum in Support) (tam). (Entered: 01/24/2022)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Filing a Copy of the Letter sent to the Georgia Department of Corrections Office of Professional Standards Regarding Disciplinary Report #907681 by DONALD GENE BARNES (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, against ANNETTIA TOBY by DONALD GENE BARNES (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MATTHEW BLACKWELL CROWDER on behalf of ANNETTIA TOBY Attorney MATTHEW BLACKWELL CROWDER added to party ANNETTIA TOBY(pty:res)(CROWDER, MATTHEW) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of ANNETTIA TOBY Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party ANNETTIA TOBY(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ; denying #3 Motion for Discovery. ; Petitioners request for counsel is also DENIED; ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DONALD GENE BARNES ; ORDER to Amend Complaint. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 2/9/2022. (tam) Modified on 2/9/2022 to add docket text (tam). (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from DONALD G. BARNES regarding plaintiff request for protective custody at Hancock State Prison. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Discovery Filed by DONALD GENE BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by DONALD GENE BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by DONALD GENE BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Grounds Raised on Motion for New Trial, #2 Exhibit B- Court of Appeals Order, #3 Exhibit C- Grounds Raised on Direct Appeal, #4 Exhibit D- Grounds Raised on State Habeas Corpus, #5 Exhibit E- Superior Court of Baldwin County Final Order, #6 Exhibit F- Affidavit of Jakari Daniel, #7 Exhibit G- Ground Exorbitant Post Conviction Delays Unconstitutional, #8 Exhibit H- Habeas Relief Requested, #9 Envelope)(tam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2022: #10 Memorandum in Support) (tam). (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Blackwell Crowder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith