This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2020 at 07:59:38 (UTC).

Barnes v. Saul

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Barnes filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosie Barnes

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charlotte Williams Hall

Attorney at Arrowood & Hall, PLLC

P.O. Box 58129

Raleigh, NC 27658

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue the summonses prepared by Plaintiff. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summonses and a copy of the complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 6/11/2020. (Collins, S.) Modified on 6/12/2020 to reflect that order was signed on 6/11/20. (Collins, S.). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Process Receipt and Return served on US Attorney General on 7/8/20. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Process Receipt and Return served on Commissioner of Social Security on 7/6/20. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service on US Attorney as to Andrew Saul served on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/5/2020. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Rosie Barnes. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue the summonses prepared by Plaintiff. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summonses and a copy of the complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 6/11/2020. (Collins, S.) Modified on 6/12/2020 to reflect that order was signed on 6/11/20. (Collins, S.). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Rosie Barnes (Hall, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of Rosie Barnes. (Hall, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Rosie Barnes. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Forms, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less