Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2021 at 09:34:16 (UTC).

Barnes v. Payne et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 Barnes filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Payne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerome T. Kearney and Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerome T. Kearney

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cambrin Barnes

Tucker, AR 72168-8713

Defendants

Dexter Payne

Byers

Marshall Reed

William Straughn

Spears

Ply

Houston

Ford

Johnson

Patterson

McDaniels

Jackson

Elizabeth Ply

Marshal Reed

Rodney Ford

John Spears

Ivory McDaniels

Shelby Houston

Lashonda Johnson

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT by Cambrin Barnes. (llg) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 Complaint form; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Compliance Office, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the Warden of the Maximum Security Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/01/2021. (ajt) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/01/2021. (lmc) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Cambrin Barnes.(kdr) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cambrin Barnes. (kdr) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT by Cambrin Barnes. (llg) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 Complaint form; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Compliance Office, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the Warden of the Maximum Security Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/01/2021. (ajt) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/01/2021. (lmc) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Cambrin Barnes.(kdr) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cambrin Barnes. (kdr) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BYER is a litigant

Latest cases where MCDANIEL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Patterson is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON'S is a litigant