This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2023 at 08:48:38 (UTC).

Barnes v. Joyce et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2022 Barnes filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Joyce. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Omar A. Williams and Robert M. Spector. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01446

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Omar A. Williams

Referral Judge

Robert M. Spector

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael J. Barnes

Defendants

David P. Joyce

ABF Freight System, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Michael P. Kenney

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP

185 Asylum St., 6Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Removal filed in State Court

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2023 Discovery due by 5/13/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2023 Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2022. (Barry, L) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/11/2022. (Barry, L) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#4

(#4) Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/11/2022. (Barry, L) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Standing Order on Removed Cases

#7

(#7) NOTICE by ABF Freight System, Inc., David P. Joyce Statement of no Pending Motions (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE re #6 Electronic Service Documents, Response to 6-1: Standing Order for Cases Removed from Superior Court filed by ABF Freight System, Inc., David P. Joyce. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABF Freight System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Corporate Parent ArcBest Corporation, Corporate Parent ABF, Inc. for ABF Freight System, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ABF Freight System, Inc., David P. Joyce.(Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ABF Freight System, Inc., David P. Joyce.(Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABF Freight System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Corporate Parent ArcBest Corporation, Corporate Parent ABF, Inc. for ABF Freight System, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE re #6 Electronic Service Documents, Response to 6-1: Standing Order for Cases Removed from Superior Court filed by ABF Freight System, Inc., David P. Joyce. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by ABF Freight System, Inc., David P. Joyce Statement of no Pending Motions (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Joint 26(f) Report due by 12/29/2022. (Mamillapalli, S.). (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ABF Freight System, Inc., David P. Joyce, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, 5 Notice 83.1,, Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Barry, L) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2022. (Barry, L) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/11/2022. (Barry, L) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/11/2022. (Barry, L) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2023 Discovery due by 5/13/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2023 Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2022. (Barry, L) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketJudge Omar A. Williams and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABF Freight System, Inc., David P. Joyce from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of Hartford, case number HHD-CV22-6161933-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BCTDC-7134319, filed by ABF Freight System, Inc., David P. Joyce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal filed in State Court)(Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABF FREIGHT SYSTEMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P. Kenney