This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:28:16 (UTC).

Barnes-Dillon v. About You Sitting Service, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Barnes-Dillon filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against About You Sitting Service, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Jane Triche Milazzo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13702

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Barnes-Dillon

Defendants

Robert Conley

Andrea Richardson

About You Sitting Service, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barrett Beasley

Attorney at Salim-Beasley, LLC

1901 Texas St.

Natchitoches, LA 71457

Katie Rose McGregor

Attorney at Bailey Cowan Heckaman PLLC

5555 San Felipe, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77056

Robert W. Cowan

Attorney at Bailey Cowan Heckaman PLLC

5555 San Felipe, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorney

Richard Allard Richardson

Attorney at Attorney at Law

9 Starbrush Circle, Ste. 102, Covington

Covington, LA 70433

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by About You Sitting Service, LLC, Robert Conley, Andrea Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard Allard Richardson added to party About You Sitting Service, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Allard Richardson added to party Robert Conley(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Allard Richardson added to party Andrea Richardson(pty:dft).(Richardson, Richard) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed; About You Sitting Service, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Robert Conley served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Andrea Richardson served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#11

(#11) **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Andrea Richardson served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#10

(#10) **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Robert Conley served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#9

(#9) **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; About You Sitting Service, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert W. Cowan for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/21/2019. (ecm) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert W. Cowan (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7987038) by Patricia Barnes-Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Beasley, Barrett) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

1 #5

Summons Robert Conley

1 #4

Summons Andrea Richardson

1 #3

Summons About You Sitting Service, LLC

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7979896) filed by Patricia Barnes-Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons About You Sitting Service, LLC, #4 Summons Andrea Richardson, #5 Summons Robert Conley)Attorney Barrett Beasley added to party Patricia Barnes-Dillon(pty:pla).(Beasley, Barrett) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 5 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). Modified text on 11/19/2019 (am). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants, About You Sitting Service, LLC; Robert Conley; and Andrea Richardson are hereby granted a thirty (30) day extension of time from which to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/17/2019. (ecm) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by About You Sitting Service, LLC, Robert Conley, Andrea Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard Allard Richardson added to party About You Sitting Service, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Allard Richardson added to party Robert Conley(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Allard Richardson added to party Andrea Richardson(pty:dft).(Richardson, Richard) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed; About You Sitting Service, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Robert Conley served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Andrea Richardson served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Andrea Richardson served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Robert Conley served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; About You Sitting Service, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert W. Cowan for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/21/2019. (ecm) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katie Rose McGregor for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert W. Cowan (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7987038) by Patricia Barnes-Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Beasley, Barrett) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katie R. McGregor (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7987004) by Patricia Barnes-Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Beasley, Barrett) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and summons. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to About You Sitting Service, LLC, Robert Conley, Andrea Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(am) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7979896) filed by Patricia Barnes-Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons About You Sitting Service, LLC, #4 Summons Andrea Richardson, #5 Summons Robert Conley)Attorney Barrett Beasley added to party Patricia Barnes-Dillon(pty:pla).(Beasley, Barrett) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 5 replaced on 11/19/2019) (am). Modified text on 11/19/2019 (am). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.