This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2020 at 09:01:02 (UTC).

Barkley et al v. 4520 Corp., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 Barkley filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 4520 Corp , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin Reidinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rita W. Barkley

Defendants

Goulds Pumps, Incorporated

Covil Corporation

GREAT BARRIER INSULATION CO., INC.

Grinnell LLC

Viking Pump, Inc.

BW/IP, Inc.

Fluor Constructors International

Crane Co.

The Gorman-Rupp Company

4520 CORP., INC.

YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC.

Fisher Controls International, LLC.

Bonitz, Inc.

Elliott Company

Aurora Pump Company

A.W. Chesterton Company

General Electric Company

Velan Valve Corp.

D & B INSULATIONS, INC.

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William M. Graham

Attorney at Wallace & Graham

525 North Main Street

Salisbury, NC 28144

Jonathan A. George

Attorney at Dean Omar Branham Shirley LLP

302 N. Market Street, Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

William M. Starr

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

301 South College Street, 23Rd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202-4000

Curtis J. Shipley

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP

Post Office Box 2752

Greensboro, NC 27402

Kimberly Sullivan

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

301 S. College St., Suite 3500

Charlotte, NC 28202

W. David Conner

Attorney at Haynsworth, Sinkler, Boyd P.A.

75 Beattie Place, 11Th Floor

Greenville, SC 29601

Scott E. Frick

Attorney at Haynsworth, Sinkler, Boyd P.A.

75 Beattie Place, 11Th Floor

Greenville, SC 29601

Jason Larry Walters

Attorney at Davis & Hamrick, LLP

635 W. 4Th St., P.O. Drawer 20039

Winston-Salem, NC 27120-0039

H. Lee Davis, Jr.

Attorney at Davis & Hamrick, L.L.P.

Po Box 20039, 635 West 4Th Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27120-0039

John T. Holden

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcoat P.C.

2115 Rexford Road, Suite 210

Charlotte, NC 28211

Philip C. Reid

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper, S.C.

411 East Wisconsin Ave., Suite 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

James M. Dedman, IV

Attorney at Gallivan, White, & Boyd, P.A.

6805 Morrison Blvd, Suite 200

Charlotte, NC 28211

Other Attorneys

Amy H. Geddes

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, LLC

1230 Main Street, Suite 700 (29201), Po Drawer 2426

Columbia, SC 29202

Mathew Ryan Groseclose

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

555 Fayetteville Street, Suite 720

Raleigh, NC 27601

E. Elaine Shofner

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP

4000 Suntrust Plaza, 303 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Peter N. Borden

Attorney at Millberg Gordon Stewart PLLC

1101 Haynes Street, Suite 104

Raleigh, NC 27604

Christopher R. Hampton

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, PLLC

Post Office Box 3463

Greensboro, NC 27402

Douglas Andrew Rubel

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP

P.O.Box 1285

Cary, NC 27512-1285

Lauren E. Fussell

Attorney at Williams Mullen

301 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1700

Raleigh, NC 27601

David B Oakley

Attorney at Poole Brooke Plumlee PC

4705 Columbus Street, Suite 100

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

31 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#134

No Description Available

#125

No Description Available

#124

No Description Available

#123

No Description Available

#119

No Description Available

#118

No Description Available

#111

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Charles W. Branham, III admitted to practice pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/27/2020. (ni) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#143

No Description Available

#132

No Description Available

#126

No Description Available

#117

No Description Available

#113

No Description Available

#112

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

5 #1

Proposed Order Admitting Charles William Branham, III

#5

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Charles W. Branham, III admitted to practice pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/27/2020. (ni) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

150 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of D&B Insulations, Inc. by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley (Paul, Kevin) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) NOTICE of Death of Plaintiff, Rita Barkley by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley (Paul, Kevin) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice to Jonathan Andrew George: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. by 10/14/2020. (Attorney George served with this Notice via NEF at jgeorge@dobslegal.com) (maf) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) ORDER granting #148 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Jonathan Andrew George is hereby granted pro hac vice admission to the bar of this Court and is added to the docket for Randy W. Barkley and Rita W. Barkley. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/7/2020. (maf) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC. (Holden, John) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC..(Holden, John) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bechtel Corporation (Groseclose, Mathew) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Andrew George Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4697356. by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Admitting Jonathan Andrew George) (Graham, William) Modified docket text on 10/5/2020. (maf) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ablest Inc. (Hampton, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) ANSWER to Complaint by Bechtel Corporation and Sequoia Ventures, Inc.(Groseclose, Mathew) Modified on 10/5/2020 to add Sequoia as a filer. NEF Regenerated. (maf) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
145 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Charles W. Branham, III admitted to practice pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/27/2020. (ni) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin W. Paul Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4636600. by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley. (Graham, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles (Trey) William Branham, III Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4636548. by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Admitting Charles William Branham, III) (Graham, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. Modified attachment description on 8/25/2020 (ni). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Charles W. Branham, III: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 8/25/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Kevin W. Paul: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 8/25/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Branham, III on behalf of Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley (Branham, Charles) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Paul on behalf of Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley (Paul, Kevin) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4619976), filed by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley.(Graham, William) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (ejb). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVIL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Blount International Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant