This case was last updated from PACER on 01/23/2021 at 12:48:35 (UTC).

Barker v. Sheriff, Jefferson County

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 Barker filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Sheriff, Jefferson County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Keith F. Giblin and Thad Heartfield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00490

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Keith F. Giblin

Presiding Judge

Thad Heartfield

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joseph Barker

Beaumont, TX 77705

Respondent

Sheriff, Jefferson County

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending Petitioner's claims should be dismissed without prejudice to petitioner's right to re-file those claims as a civil rights action filed pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/11/2021. (bjc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#3

(#3) AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Sheriff, Jefferson County, filed by Joseph Barker. Related document(s): #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Barker.(bjc, ) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 112/8/2020 by Joseph Barker as to #2 Order. (ttp, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDERED that plaintiff has 20 days from the date of this order to file an amended pleading that contains a more detailed factual discussion explaining his basis of recovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 12/4/2020. (bjc, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Barker.(bmf, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending Petitioner's claims should be dismissed without prejudice to petitioner's right to re-file those claims as a civil rights action filed pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/11/2021. (bjc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Sheriff, Jefferson County, filed by Joseph Barker. Related document(s): #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Barker.(bjc, ) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 112/8/2020 by Joseph Barker as to #2 Order. (ttp, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDERED that plaintiff has 20 days from the date of this order to file an amended pleading that contains a more detailed factual discussion explaining his basis of recovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 12/4/2020. (bjc, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (bmf, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Barker.(bmf, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less