This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2021 at 09:52:53 (UTC).

Barela v. REI Automation

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Barela filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against REI Automation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas E Rogers, III and J Michelle Childs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00844

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas E Rogers, III

Presiding Judge

J Michelle Childs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jared Barela

Defendant

REI Automation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr

Attorney at Dickey Law Group LLC

440 Center Street

West Columbia, SC 29169

Defendant Attorneys

Sheila M Willis

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

1320 Main Street, Suite 750

Columbia, SC 29201

Stephen Carrington Mitchell

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips

Po Box 11612

Columbia, SC 29211

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/11/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/25/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 5/25/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/19/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/17/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/16/2021, Discovery due by 11/15/2021, Motions due by 11/30/2021, ADR Statement due by 12/31/2021, Mediation Due by 1/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/19/2021. (dsto, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by REI Automation. (Mitchell, Stephen). Modified on 4/1/2021 to correct event type. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jared Barela.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by REI Automation.(prou, ) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-40-0580. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9728345), filed by REI Automation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings)(prou, ) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/11/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/25/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 5/25/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/19/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/17/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/16/2021, Discovery due by 11/15/2021, Motions due by 11/30/2021, ADR Statement due by 12/31/2021, Mediation Due by 1/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/19/2021. (dsto, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by REI Automation. (Mitchell, Stephen). Modified on 4/1/2021 to correct event type. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jared Barela.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by REI Automation.(prou, ) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-40-0580. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9728345), filed by REI Automation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings)(prou, ) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr.