This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:39:26 (UTC).

Regina Bardell et al v. Garfield Beach CVS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Regina Bardell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Garfield Beach CVS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regina Bardell

Petitioner

DOES 1 through 20 inclusive

Defendants

Garfield Beach CVS LLC

Does 1 through 20, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel W Baruch

Attorney at Law Offices of Joel W Baruch PC

2601 Main Street Suite 980

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Keith Haeffele

Attorney at Payne and Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Daniel F Fears

Attorney at Payne and Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Jason I Bluver

Attorney at Payne and Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

9 #3

Exhibit C

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC, identifying CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; Garfield Beach CVS, LLC; CVS Health Corporation. (Haeffele, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

9 #4

Exhibit D

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC.(Attorney Jason I Bluver added to party Garfield Beach CVS LLC(pty:dft))(Bluver, Jason) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#10

(#10) Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Binding Arbitration filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Bluver, Jason) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION of Andrew K. Haeffele re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Haeffele, Andrew) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit B

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

9 #5

Exhibit E

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Stay Action and Proceed In Binding Arbitration #10 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that (2) All causes of action in Plaintiff's Complaint shall proceed in binding arbitration; (2) This matter is stayed pending completion of the arbitration proceedings, and; (3) All future dates, including the 2/28/2020, Scheduling Conference are hereby VACATED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/28/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. Review document for details. (tg) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #2

Proposed Order

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01115861 Receipt No: 0973-25063159 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Andrew Keith Haeffele added to party Garfield Beach CVS LLC(pty:dft))(Haeffele, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Stay Action and Proceed In Binding Arbitration #10 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that (2) All causes of action in Plaintiff's Complaint shall proceed in binding arbitration; (2) This matter is stayed pending completion of the arbitration proceedings, and; (3) All future dates, including the 2/28/2020, Scheduling Conference are hereby VACATED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Binding Arbitration filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Bluver, Jason) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Andrew K. Haeffele re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Haeffele, Andrew) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/28/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. Review document for details. (tg) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC.(Attorney Jason I Bluver added to party Garfield Beach CVS LLC(pty:dft))(Bluver, Jason) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, Inclusive, Garfield Beach CVS LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Regina Bardell. Filed in State Court on 12/3/19 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC, identifying CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; Garfield Beach CVS, LLC; CVS Health Corporation. (Haeffele, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC. (Haeffele, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01115861 Receipt No: 0973-25063159 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Andrew Keith Haeffele added to party Garfield Beach CVS LLC(pty:dft))(Haeffele, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less