This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 12:46:31 (UTC).

Barclift v. Twitter, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Barclift filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Twitter, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen, Beth Labson Freeman and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-07992

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

Presiding Judges

Beth Labson Freeman

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Khafre Barclift

Petitioners

Twitter Investor Group

Weston Family Partnership LLLP

Defendants

Twitter, Inc.

Jack Dorsey

Ned Segal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Jennifer Pafiti

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

1100 Glendon Avenue, Suite 1558

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Jeremy A Lieberman

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Laurence D. King

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1560

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth L. Deeley

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Hilary Hellmuth Mattis

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott. Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Michele D. Johnson

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 2000

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Appointing Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Approving Co-Lead Counsel filed by Weston Family Partnership LLLP, Twitter Investor Group. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/21/2020) Modified on 1/22/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#25

(#25) ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Extending Time For All Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/17/2020.(ygrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#24

(#24) >Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Non-Opposition of The Weston Family Partnership LLLP to Competing Motions for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Counsel by Weston Family Partnership LLLP (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/14/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#23

(#23) Notice that the Motion of the Twitter Investor Group for Consolidation of the Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Co-Lead Counsel is Unopposed by Twitter Investor Group (King, Laurence) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/14/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

22 #1

Declaration of Hilary H. Mattis in Support of Stipulation Extending Time for All

#22

(#22) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Jack Dorsey, Ned Segal, Twitter, Inc., Khafre Barclift. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hilary H. Mattis in Support of Stipulation Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint)(Johnson, Michele) (Filed on 1/7/2020) Modified on 1/8/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

21 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#21

(#21) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings re #20 Order Relating Case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER RELATING CASES 4:19-cv-7149-YGR and 5:19-cv-7992-BLF. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/2/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#7

(#17) ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION TO APPEAR IN PRO HAC VICE (JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/19/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Jack Dorsey, Ned Segal, Twitter, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

4 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Schedule A

1 #1

Certification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jack Dorsey, Ned Segal, Twitter, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13952255.). Filed byKhafre Barclift. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Appointing Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Approving Co-Lead Counsel filed by Weston Family Partnership LLLP, Twitter Investor Group. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/21/2020) Modified on 1/22/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Extending Time For All Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/17/2020.(ygrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) >Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Non-Opposition of The Weston Family Partnership LLLP to Competing Motions for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Counsel by Weston Family Partnership LLLP (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/14/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Notice that the Motion of the Twitter Investor Group for Consolidation of the Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Co-Lead Counsel is Unopposed by Twitter Investor Group (King, Laurence) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/14/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Jack Dorsey, Ned Segal, Twitter, Inc., Khafre Barclift. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hilary H. Mattis in Support of Stipulation Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint)(Johnson, Michele) (Filed on 1/7/2020) Modified on 1/8/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings re #20 Order Relating Case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER RELATING CASES 4:19-cv-7149-YGR and 5:19-cv-7992-BLF. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/2/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE by Khafre Barclift Notice of Publication of Press Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #15 STIPULATION AND EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT TO JANUARY 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/19/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION TO APPEAR IN PRO HAC VICE (JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/19/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary Hellmuth Mattis on behalf of Defendants Twitter, Inc., Jack Dorsey and Ned Segal (Mattis, Hilary) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. Deeley on behalf of Defendants Twitter, Inc., Jack Dorsey and Ned Segal (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Twitter, Inc., Jack Dorsey and Ned Segal (Johnson, Michele) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13971834.) filed by Khafre Barclift. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Jack Dorsey, Ned Segal, Twitter, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jack Dorsey, Ned Segal, Twitter, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13952255.). Filed byKhafre Barclift. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.