This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:27:51 (UTC).

Barbour et al v. Peoples Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Barbour filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Peoples Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey J. Helmick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02816

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roger Barbour

Felicia Barbour

Defendants

Total Distribution, Inc.

Peoples Cartage, Inc.

Peoples Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles E. Boyk

Attorney at Law Office of Charles E. Boyk

405 Madison Avenue

Toledo, OH 43604

Kathleen R. Harris

Attorney at Law Office of Charles E. Boyk

405 Madison Avenue

Toledo, OH 43604

Defendant Attorney

Bradley A. Powell

Attorney at Droder & Miller

Suite 700, 250 East Fifth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Peoples Services, Inc. on 1/17/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Total Distribution, Inc. on 1/9/2020, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Peoples Cartage, Inc. waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#2

(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Peoples Cartage, Inc., Peoples Services, Inc., Total Distribution, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9658848.. Filed by Roger Barbour, Felicia Barbour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Boyk, Charles) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Peoples Services, Inc. on 1/17/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Total Distribution, Inc. on 1/9/2020, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Peoples Cartage, Inc. waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Peoples Cartage, Inc., Peoples Services, Inc., Total Distribution, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9658848.. Filed by Roger Barbour, Felicia Barbour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Boyk, Charles) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.