This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2022 at 07:54:47 (UTC).

Barbosa v. Minnesota Wanner et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Barbosa filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Minnesota Wanner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy E. Brasel and John F. Docherty. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-00805

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy E. Brasel

Referral Judge

John F. Docherty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marcus Barbosa, Sr.

Marcus Barbosa, Sr

Defendants

Minnesota Wanner Company

Altec, Inc.

Altec Industries, Inc.

Altec Utility Equipment Co, Inc.

Minnesota Wanner

Altec, Inc

Altec Industries, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Genevieve M Zimmerman

Attorney at Meshbesher & Spence

1616 Park Avenue

Mpls, MN 55404

Jason Eric Robinson

Attorney at Denney & Barrett, P.C.

870 Copperfield Drive, Ste A

Norman, OK 73072

Kyle W. Farrar

Attorney at Kaster, Lynch, Farrar & Ball, LLP

1117 Herkimer Street

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie M Laws

Attorney at Maslon LLP

80 South 8Th Street, Suite 1300

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Nathaniel John Ajouri

Attorney at Maslon LLP

3300 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4140

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Stephanie M. Laws re #1 Notice of Removal, by Altec Industries, Inc. . (Laws, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#3

(#3) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED//RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Altec Industries, Inc.. (Laws, Stephanie) Modified text on 4/5/2022 (ACH). (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Altec Industries, Inc. (Laws, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Altec, Inc, Altec Industries, Inc , Altec Utility Equipment Co, Inc. by Marcus Barbosa, Sr (Zimmerman, Genevieve) Modified text on 4/6/2022 (MTB). (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#8

(#8) EXHIBIT Notice of Filing/Notice of Removal filed in State Court re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Altec Industries, Inc. (Laws, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Altec Industries, Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, (Laws, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 4/28/2022.(TJS) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason Robinson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9490237 filed by Marcus Barbosa, Sr. (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marcus Barbosa, Sr. (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/26/2022. (KMW) cc: Hennepin County District Court. Modified text on 5/26/2022 (ACH). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#15

(#15) LETTER from Clerk's Office to Hennepin County District Court enclosing #14 Order of Remand. c/c: Hennepin County District Court. (ACH) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#16

(#16) LETTER from Hennepin County District Court acknowledging receipt of Order of Remand #14 . (MMG) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LETTER from Hennepin County District Court acknowledging receipt of Order of Remand #14 . (MMG) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LETTER from Clerk's Office to Hennepin County District Court enclosing #14 Order of Remand. c/c: Hennepin County District Court. (ACH) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/26/2022. (KMW) cc: Hennepin County District Court. Modified text on 5/26/2022 (ACH). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason Eric Robinson for Marcus Barbosa, Sr. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/5/2022. (KMO) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marcus Barbosa, Sr. (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason Robinson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9490237 filed by Marcus Barbosa, Sr. (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 4/28/2022.(TJS) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Altec Industries, Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, (Laws, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXHIBIT Notice of Filing/Notice of Removal filed in State Court re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Altec Industries, Inc. (Laws, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Text added: Without Prejudice as to Altec, Inc, Altec Industries, Inc, Altec Utility Equipment Co, Inc. (MTB) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Altec, Inc, Altec Industries, Inc , Altec Utility Equipment Co, Inc. by Marcus Barbosa, Sr (Zimmerman, Genevieve) Modified text on 4/6/2022 (MTB). (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Altec Industries, Inc. (Laws, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-805 NEB/JFD. (kt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kyle Farrar as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED//RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Altec Industries, Inc.. (Laws, Stephanie) Modified text on 4/5/2022 (ACH). (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Stephanie M. Laws re #1 Notice of Removal, by Altec Industries, Inc. . (Laws, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number pending (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9425283) filed by Altec Industries, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Laws, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTEC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTEC INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle W Farrar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason E Robinson