This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2019 at 07:24:44 (UTC).

Barbieri v. GL Staffing Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 Barbieri filed an Other lawsuit against GL Staffing Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lurana S. Snow and William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-61520

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adriana Barbieri

Defendant

GL Staffing Services, Inc.

1709 Banks Road, Building A, Unit 5

Margate, FL 33063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 Se 6Th St., 17Th Floor

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Thomas John Patti, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 S.E. 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Steven Gary Schwartz

Attorney at Schwartz Law Group

6751 N Federal Highway, Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Zachary Minei

#6

#7

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Adriana Barbieri (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by Adriana Barbieri. Replies due by 8/19/2019. (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by GL Staffing Services, Inc.. Attorney Steven Gary Schwartz added to party GL Staffing Services, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Zachary Minei)(Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Requiring counsel to meet, file Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to GL Staffing Services, Inc.. (ebz) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against GL Staffing Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11742167, filed by Adriana Barbieri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hindi, Jibrael) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GL STAFFING SERV INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven G. Schwartz