This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 09:34:32 (UTC).

Barber v. Medical Department et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Barber filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Medical Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Polster Chappell and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00693

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Junior Barber

Arcadia, FL 34266

Defendants

Medical Department

Cherin Alderdioe

Annett Alderman

Amanda Miller

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (drn) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#6

(#6) OPINION AND ORDER re: #1 Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/19/2020. (SLU) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

5 #1

Mailing Envelope

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Charles Junior Barber. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 09/28/2020)

4 #2

Mailing Envelope

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles Junior Barber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(drn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#3

(#3) TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/9/2020. (drn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/9/2020. (drn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cherin Alderdioe, Annett Alderman, Medical Department, Amanda Miller with Jury Demand (no service copies; no fee/ifp) filed by Charles Junior Barber. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (drn) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OPINION AND ORDER re: #1 Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/19/2020. (SLU) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Charles Junior Barber. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles Junior Barber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(drn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/9/2020. (drn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/9/2020. (drn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cherin Alderdioe, Annett Alderman, Medical Department, Amanda Miller with Jury Demand (no service copies; no fee/ifp) filed by Charles Junior Barber. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less