This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2021 at 08:08:54 (UTC).

Barber v. BW Offshore USA Management, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Barber filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against BW Offshore USA Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02106

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Barber

Defendants

Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA

BW Offshore USA Management, Inc.

BW OFFSHORE USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Paul Skrabanek

Attorney at Pierce Skrabanek, PLLC

3701 Kirby Dr., Ste 760

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Goldstein

Attorney at Hicks Thomas LLP

700 Louisiana St., Ste. 2300

Houston, TX 77002

James Stephen Barrick

Attorney at Hicks Thomas LLP

700 Louisiana St., Ste. 2300

Houston, TX 77002

Megan LeBato Reinkemeyer

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 1800

Houston, TX 77002

Zoe W Vermeulen

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

909 Poydras St, Ste 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

22 #2

Proposed Order

22 #1

Exhibit A

#22

#21

18 #2

Amended Answer

18 #1

Proposed Order

#14

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #3

List of Parties and Counsel

1 #2

Index of Matters Being Filed

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against BW OFFSHORE USA, LLC, Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA filed by John Barber.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by John Barber, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Skrabanek, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint with Jury by BW OFFSHORE USA, LLC, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by BW OFFSHORE USA, LLC, filed. (Reinkemeyer, Megan) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Petition on Behalf of BW Offshore USA, LLC by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amended Answer)(Reinkemeyer, Megan) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed.(Reinkemeyer, Megan) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed.(Reinkemeyer, Megan) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Against it in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrick, James) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed.(Reinkemeyer, Megan) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Barber, filed.(Skrabanek, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA, filed.(Barrick, James) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Zoe Vermeulen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2021. (ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Setting as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2021 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Barrick, James) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed.(Reinkemeyer, Megan) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN REMOVED ACTION by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed.(Reinkemeyer, Megan) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/15/2021 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26658553) filed by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Matters Being Filed, #3 List of Parties and Counsel, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Reinkemeyer, Megan) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Murphy Exploration & Production Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Paul Skrabanek