This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 07:29:10 (UTC).

Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H B , a minor filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is F. Dennis Saylor, IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12448

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

F. Dennis Saylor, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

H. B., a minor

Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor

Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor

Defendant

GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kimberly Barone Baden

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Blvd.

Mt. Pleasant, SC 29464

Ann E. Rice Ervin

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Boulevard

Mt. Pleasant, SC 29464

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer M. Stevenson

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7996946 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by H. B., a minor, Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Baden, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann E. Rice Ervin on behalf of H. B., a minor, Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor (Rice Ervin, Ann) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline (Stevenson, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, H. B., a minor, Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor. GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Rice Ervin, Ann) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#13) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 1/27/2020.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard updates on GSK's citizen petition to the FDA and related discovery requests, including those for communications between GSK and Novartis.3) The Court heard updates on discovery related to Dr. Zambelli-Weiner's report. 4) The Court heard updates on supplemental expert reports produced in response to new scientific data that has become available. 5) The parties alerted the Court of their proposed amendments to the pretrial scheduling order in Rodriguez, 15-cv-13762. An amended version of that order will issue shortly. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (877) 876-9174 and Conference ID: ZOFRANMDL, for the Status Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 1:30 PM.REMINDER: Counsel who wish to address the court by telephone must notify the courtroom deputy by email prior to the conference. Counsel who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE re 1791 Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2020 at 10:30 AM. Counsel may attend the hearing by telephone. Please use the following dial-in information: DIAL IN: 1-888-675-2535, ACCESS CODE: 7629998. REMINDER: Your telephone line should be MUTED, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear any background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE re 1774 Status Conference and Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM. Counsel may attend the hearing by telephone. Please use the following dial-in information: DIAL IN: 1-888-675-2535, ACCESS CODE: 7629998. REMINDER: Your telephone line should be MUTED, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear any background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket(#9) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 12/16/2019.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard the parties responses to its letter to the FDA, which was sent on December 13, 2019, regarding GSKs citizen petition (FDA-2019-P-5151-0001). 3) The Court heard updates on discovery regarding communications between GSK and Novartis. GSK made a supplemental production on December 13, 2019, and anticipates completing production by December 31, 2019. 4) The Court heard updates on discovery related to Dr. Zambelli-Weiners report. The parties currently intend to schedule her additional deposition for early January 2020.5) The Court set status conferences for 1/15/2020 10:00 a.m., 2/20/2020 1:30 p.m., and 3/18/2020 1:30 p.m. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (877) 876-9174 and Conference ID: Zofran, for the Status Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 1:30 PM. REMINDER: Counsel who wish to address the court by telephone must notify the courtroom deputy by email prior to the conference. Counsel who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, H. B., a minor, Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor. GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Rice Ervin, Ann) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline (Stevenson, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann E. Rice Ervin on behalf of H. B., a minor, Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor (Rice Ervin, Ann) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Barber, Individually and as Natural Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, et al. v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC d/b/a GlasoSmithKline. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7996946 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by H. B., a minor, Dena Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor, Payton Barber, Individually and as Natual Parent and Guardian of H.B., a minor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Baden, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.