This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2021 at 15:50:29 (UTC).

Barber et al v. GPM Investments, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Barber filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against GPM Investments, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00530

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bette Kristine Barber

Edith Lucinda Palmer

Defendants

GPM Investments, LLC

TX GPM Investments, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen Ryan Vaught

Attorney at Vaught Firm, LLC

1910 Pacific Ave, Suite 9150

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorney

John B Brown

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#9

9 #1

Proposed Order

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND: Before the Court is Defendant's Second Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. ECF No. #9 . After considering the agreed motion, the Court concludes it should be and hereby is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is EXTENDED until June 16, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/17/2021) (tln) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/17/2021) (tln). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Agreed) filed by GPM Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, John) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED until May 17, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/11/2021) (sre) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by GPM Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John B Brown added to party GPM Investments, LLC(pty:dft) (Brown, John) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to GPM Investments, LLC ; served on 4/12/2021. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to GPM Investments, LLC. (tln) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Bette Kristine Barber, Edith Lucinda Palmer. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bette Kristine Barber, Edith Lucinda Palmer. (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against GPM Investments, LLC filed by Bette Kristine Barber, Edith Lucinda Palmer. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11785967) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Vaught, Allen) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen R Vaught