This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2019 at 07:34:04 (UTC).

Baraily v. US Social Security Administration, Commissioner

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 Baraily filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against US Social Security Administration, Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrea K. Johnstone and Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00857

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrea K. Johnstone

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pampha Maya Baraily

Defendant

US Social Security Administration, Commissioner

Not Classified By Court

US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)

US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Janine Gawryl

Attorney at Gawryl MacAllister & O'Connor

41 E Pearl St

Nashua, NH 03060

David F. Chermol

Attorney at Chermol & Fishman LLC

11450 Bustleton Ave

Philadelphia, PA 19116

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(de) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1851717.) filed by Pampha Maya Baraily. Follow up on Objection on 9/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit), #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Gawryl, Janine) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summonses issued electronically as to US Social Security Administration, Commissioner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE case referred to Magistrate Judge for Report & Recommendation. Copy of SSA Order of Reference attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Notice in SSA Case, #3 SSA - ADM Order of Reference) (mc) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (mc) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Copy of ADM-1 Order 14-2 referring 12.5% of all SSA review cases to the Magistrate Judge for report and recommendation. Copy sent to plaintiff's counsel for notice and for service on defendant. (mc) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-857-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Pampha Maya Baraily. Follow up on Objection on 9/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gawryl, Janine) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/SSA COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Pampha Maya Baraily. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver)(Gawryl, Janine) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less