This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/27/2023 at 06:10:03 (UTC).

Bar-Lev v. City of San Diego, et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 Bar-Lev filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of San Diego,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison H. Goddard and Dana M. Sabraw. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00139

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison H. Goddard

Presiding Judge

Dana M. Sabraw

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Naomi Bar-Lev

Defendants

Does 1-100

City of San Diego

Jonathan Dungan

Jason Langley

Jeffrey Stewart

Melanie Olguin

Kyle Olson

Jeffrey Jordan

Colin Forsey

Mike Kellington

Dan Brinkerhof

Bradford Green

Gordon Leek

Alan R. Dyemartin

Eric Skyhar

Marissa Haughey

Marisa Gallegos

Natalie Biasavich

Brittny Scharber

40 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against City of San Diego et al, IFP Filed & Pending, filed by Naomi Bar-Lev. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-139-MMA-MSB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(maq) (jrm). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Naomi Bar-Lev. (maq) (jrm). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge The new case number is 3:23-cv-00139-LL-MSB. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/26/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ave) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#8

(#8) Letter from Naomi Bar-Lev (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from Naomi Bar-Lev (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv0139-DMS-AHG.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mjw) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv0139-DMS-DDL.(no document attached) (ggv) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Linda Lopez is no longer assigned. Case randomly reassigned to Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv139-DMS(MSB).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge The new case number is 3:23-cv-00139-LL-MSB. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/26/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ave) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 23cv139-JLS-MSB.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (maq) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Naomi Bar-Lev. (maq) (jrm). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against City of San Diego et al, IFP Filed & Pending, filed by Naomi Bar-Lev. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-139-MMA-MSB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(maq) (jrm). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less