This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2022 at 08:27:26 (UTC).

Baptiste v. Merrick Garland et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 Baptiste filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Merrick Garland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Chris M. McAliley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-22043

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Chris M. McAliley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonnfred Baptiste

Miami, FL 33150

Defendants

Attorney General of the United States

Secretary for the Deparment of Homeland Security (DHS)

Director for Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Noticing INS Attorney

Natalie Diaz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 Ne 4Th Street, 3Rd Floor

Miami, FL 33132

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Supplement Cover Sheet included

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sonnfred Baptiste. (pc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/11/2022) (pc). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Pretrial Non-Dispositive and Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Sonnfred Baptiste. (pc) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service Ordered and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER REGARDING REMOVAL OF PERSONAL IDENTIFYING INFORMATION re #1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Director for Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary for the Deparment of Homeland Security (DHS). (jas) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER Regarding Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (nsy) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (jas) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

14 #14

Main Document

14 #1

Exhibit A- Oath of Allegiance (USCIS Form G-1222)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus,, for Mootness by Attorney General of the United States, Director for Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary for the Deparment of Homeland Security (DHS). Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Attorney General of the United States(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Director for Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Secretary for the Deparment of Homeland Security (DHS)(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Oath of Allegiance (USCIS Form G-1222))(Diaz, Natalie) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #11 ORDER Regarding Summons. (Summons packet delivered via 8th floor mailbox to the US Marshals Service.). (jas) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (jas) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Regarding Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (nsy) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Summons packet delivered via 8th floor mailbox to the US Marshals Service.). (jas) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Director for Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary for the Deparment of Homeland Security (DHS). (jas) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING REMOVAL OF PERSONAL IDENTIFYING INFORMATION re #1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service Ordered and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Sonnfred Baptiste. (pc) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Pretrial Non-Dispositive and Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sonnfred Baptiste. (pc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/11/2022) (pc). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pc) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus against Ur M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Merrick Garland. Filing fee $ 402.00 (FEE NOT PAID) IFP Filed by Sonnfred Baptiste.(pc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2022: #1 Supplement Cover Sheet included) (pc). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/12/2022) (jas). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/12/2022) (jas). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2022: #2 Redacted page 4 of Complaint) (jas). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2022: #3 Redacted page 4 from Supplement Cover Sheet) (jas). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natalie Diaz