This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2022 at 06:16:47 (UTC).

Baptiste v. First Watch Restaurants, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/11/2021 Baptiste filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against First Watch Restaurants, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William Matthewman and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-82057

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William Matthewman

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Menasse Baptiste

West Palm Beach, FL 33403

Jelani Barnes

Boynton Beach, FL 33436

Defendant

First Watch Restaurants, Inc. a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as First Watch Restaurant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Saul Remer

Attorney at Remer & Georges-Pierre, PLLC

44 West Flagler Street, Suite 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Daniel H. Hunt

Attorney at Daniel H. Hunt, Esq.

Po Box 565096

Miami, FL 33256

Defendant Attorneys

Joyce Ackerbaum Cox

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

200 S Orange Avenue, Suite 2300 Po Box 112

Orlando, FL 32802-0112

Mary Caroline Cravatta

Attorney at Baker , Hostetler

200 South Orange Ave., Suite 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Nailah Donnaye Bowen

Attorney at BakerHostetler

200 South Orange Avenue, Suite 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) ORDER CLOSING CASE. Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#38

(#38) STIPULATION of Dismissal by First Watch Restaurants, Inc. (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#37

(#37) ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY, granting in part #34 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#36

(#36) ORDER TERMINATING ATTORNEY. Attorney Jason Saul Remer representing Baptiste, Menasse (Plaintiff) and Barnes, Jelani (Plaintiff) terminated. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Compliance by Menasse Baptiste, Jelani Barnes re #33 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, (Remer, Jason) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

34 #1

Text of Proposed Order

34 #34

Main Document

#33

(#33) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND EXTENDING DEADLINES,granting in part #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Deadline to obtain new counsel 7/6/2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#27

(#31) RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jason S. Remer for / filed by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. Replies due by 6/21/2022. (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nailah Donnaye Bowen on behalf of First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. Attorney Nailah Donnaye Bowen added to party First Watch Restaurants, Inc.(pty:dft). (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#5

(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against First Watch Restaurants, Inc., filed by Menasse Baptiste.(Hunt, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Watch Restaurants, Inc. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court File

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER CLOSING CASE. Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) STIPULATION of Dismissal by First Watch Restaurants, Inc. (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY, granting in part #34 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER TERMINATING ATTORNEY. Attorney Jason Saul Remer representing Baptiste, Menasse (Plaintiff) and Barnes, Jelani (Plaintiff) terminated. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Compliance by Menasse Baptiste, Jelani Barnes re #33 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, (Remer, Jason) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION to Stay Pretrial and Trial Activities and to Reset Deadlines by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND EXTENDING DEADLINES,granting in part #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Deadline to obtain new counsel 7/6/2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re #23 Order on Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jason S. Remer for / filed by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. Replies due by 6/21/2022. (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #25 Notice (Other), 26 Order,,,, Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings,,, by Menasse Baptiste, Jelani Barnes. (Remer, Jason) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/22 at 2:00 PM in the West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the scheduling conference. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/7/2022. (no00) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Scheduling Conference, and Setting Trial Date. ( Calendar Call set for 7/27/2022 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Menasse Baptiste (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Remer, Jason) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nailah Donnaye Bowen on behalf of First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. Attorney Nailah Donnaye Bowen added to party First Watch Restaurants, Inc.(pty:dft). (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against First Watch Restaurants, Inc., filed by Menasse Baptiste.(Hunt, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Watch Restaurants, Inc. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15166214,no answer/affirmative defenses filed by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court File)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) Modified text on 11/14/2021 (mee). (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Watch Restaurants, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nailah Donnaye Bowen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Caroline Cravatta