This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2019 at 07:09:02 (UTC).

Sam Seyd Banuri v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Sam Seyd Banuri filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bankers Life and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05720

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sam Seyd Banuri

Defendants

COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

CNO Financial Group, Inc.

Bankers Life and Casualty Company

K.F. AGENCY, INC.

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph M Lovretovich

Attorney at JML Law APLC

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Eric Meier Gruzen

Attorney at JML Law APLC

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Christina Rodriguez Manalo

Attorney at JML Law APLC

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

William Hays Weissman

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

1255 Treat Boulevard Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Declaration of Nate Richardson ISO Removal

1 #2

Declaration of Karl Kindig ISO Removal

1 #1

Declaration of William Hays Weissman ISO Removal

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court State of CA, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court State of CA, County of Los Angeles. (lom) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE ORDER(In Chambers) Order Remanding Action by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Sam Seyd Banuri.. (Lovretovich, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Sam Seyd Banuri, (Lovretovich, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number reads CV 19-05720-CAS-KS, but should read CV 19-05720-FMO-KS. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Colonial Penn Life Insurance Company, K.F. Agency, Inc., re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 8 Re Initial Standing Order of Judge Fernando M. Olguin served on July 11, 2019. (Weissman, William) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Sam Seyd Banuri, (Lovretovich, Joseph) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-00187 FMO(KSx). Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05720 FMO(KSx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Colonial Penn Life Insurance Company, K.F. Agency, Inc.(FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1)(lh) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Colonial Penn Life Insurance Company, Does 1 through 50, K.F. Agency, Inc. amending Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Sam Seyd Banuri. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/20/2019 SUBMITTED BATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 )(lh) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Colonial Penn Life Insurance Company, Does 1 through 50, K.F. Agency, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Sam Seyd Banuri. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/29/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, 1-1 #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, K.F. AGENCY, INC., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on 7/1/2019. (Weissman, William) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, K.F. AGENCY, INC., identifying CDOC, Inc.; Conseco Life Insurance Company of Texas. (Weissman, William) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, K.F. AGENCY, INC.. (Weissman, William) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV10920 Receipt No: 0973-24012944 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants CNO Financial Group, Inc., COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, Bankers Life and Casualty Company, K.F. AGENCY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Hays Weissman ISO Removal, #2 Declaration of Karl Kindig ISO Removal, #3 Declaration of Nate Richardson ISO Removal) (Attorney William Hays Weissman added to party Bankers Life and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney William Hays Weissman added to party CNO Financial Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William Hays Weissman added to party COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft), Attorney William Hays Weissman added to party K.F. AGENCY, INC.(pty:dft))(Weissman, William) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.F. Agency, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CNO Financial Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AN IOWA is a litigant