This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2020 at 08:30:12 (UTC).

Banner Life Insurance Company v. Anderson et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Banner Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Banner Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Talese L. Anderson

Jordan M. Eggers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel A Didle

Samuel Andrew Diddle

Attorney at EBERLE BERLIN KADING TURNBOW & MCKLVEEN

Pob 1368

Boise, ID 83701

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by David R Auxier on behalf of Jordan M. Eggers (Auxier, David)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Talese L. Anderson, Banner Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/11/2020. (alw)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banner Life Insurance Company. Jordan M. Eggers served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Diddle, Samuel)

6 #1

Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Jordan M. Eggers by Talese L. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Logan, Shawn)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banner Life Insurance Company. Talese L. Anderson served on 2/16/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Diddle, Samuel)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Banner Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Legal & General Group PLC for Banner Life Insurance Company.. (Diddle, Samuel)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Talese L. Anderson, Jordan M. Eggers. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry. (Diddle, Samuel)

1 #3

Summons Talese Anderson

1 #2

Summons Jordan Eggers

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Banner Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2000460.), filed by Banner Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Jordan Eggers, #3 Summons Talese Anderson)(Diddle, Samuel)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by David R Auxier on behalf of Jordan M. Eggers (Auxier, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Talese L. Anderson, Banner Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/11/2020. (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banner Life Insurance Company. Jordan M. Eggers served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Diddle, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Jordan M. Eggers by Talese L. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Logan, Shawn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banner Life Insurance Company. Talese L. Anderson served on 2/16/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Diddle, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Banner Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Legal & General Group PLC for Banner Life Insurance Company.. (Diddle, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Talese L. Anderson, Jordan M. Eggers. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry. (Diddle, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Banner Life Insurance Company was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-file the Cover Sheet with a date and signature.(alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Banner Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2000460.), filed by Banner Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Jordan Eggers, #3 Summons Talese Anderson)(Diddle, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less