This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 09:48:02 (UTC).

Banman v. Syke Orthobiologics, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Banman filed an Other lawsuit against Syke Orthobiologics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-MC-00663

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bryan Banman

CTM Biomedical, LLC

Defendants

Skye Orthobiologics, LLC

Human Regenerative Technologies, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erica Benites Giese

Attorney at Jackson Walker L.L.P.

112 E. Pecan Street, Suite 2400

San Antonio, TX 78205-1510

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan D. Saba

Attorney at Rosen Saba, LLP

9350 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 250

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Alicia M. Barrs

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

2121 North Pearl Street, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

12 #1

Exhibit Declaration by R. Fluskey

#12

#11

#10

9 #2

Exhibit A

#9

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#5

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Filing Fee Receipt

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE to #13 Notice (Other) by Bryan Banman, CTM Biomedical, LLC. (Giese, Erica) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED: referred #1 MOTION to Quash and for a Protective Order. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of entry of Protective Order in Underlying California Lawsuit by Human Regenerative Technologies, LLC, Skye Orthobiologics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saba, Ryan) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #1 Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for a Protective Order by Bryan Banman, CTM Biomedical, LLC. to United States Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Bryan Banman, CTM Biomedical, LLC, re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Plaintiff CTM Biomedical, LLC, Plaintiff Bryan Banman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration by R. Fluskey)(Giese, Erica) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Miscellaneous Objection to #1 MOTION to Quash Declaration of Robert Fluskey by Human Regenerative Technologies, LLC, Skye Orthobiologics, LLC. (Saba, Ryan) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Miscellaneous Objection to #1 MOTION to Quash Declaration of Bryan Banman by Human Regenerative Technologies, LLC, Skye Orthobiologics, LLC. (Saba, Ryan) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Human Regenerative Technologies, LLC, Skye Orthobiologics, LLC, re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Plaintiff CTM Biomedical, LLC, Plaintiff Bryan Banman (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan Saba, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Saba, Ryan) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Ryan D. Saba; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500058243. (rg) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan D. Saba. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan D. Saba by on behalf of Human Regenerative Technologies, LLC, Skye Orthobiologics, LLC. (rg) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by Human Regenerative Technologies, LLC, Skye Orthobiologics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrs, Alicia) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Confirm Page Limitation Compliance. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Motion to Confirm Page Limitation Compliance is GRANTED, insofar as Plaintiffs Motion (docket no. 1) will be accepted in its current length, and Defendants may file a response of up to 20 pages in length entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING A PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE FILE THE PROPOSED ORDER ONLY (USING THE ATTACHMENT EVENT/EDIT TEXT) AND LINK TO THE ORIGINAL MOTION.*** re #4 MOTION to Confirm Page Limitation Compliance re #1 MOTION to Quash (bc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING A PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE FILE THE PROPOSED ORDER ONLY (USING THE ATTACHMENT EVENT/EDIT TEXT) AND LINK TO THE ORIGINAL MOTION.*** MOTION to Confirm Page Limitation Compliance re #1 MOTION to Quash by Bryan Banman, CTM Biomedical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Giese, Erica) Modified on 7/15/2021 To edit text (bc). (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Motion and Certificate of Service by Bryan Banman, CTM Biomedical, LLC re #1 MOTION to Quash (Giese, Erica) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Attorney Admission Letter sent to Ryan D. Saba. (dtg) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Quash Subpoenas and for a Protective Order by Bryan Banman, CTM Biomedical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (dtg) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketTHIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE ORLANDO L. GARCIA. (dtg) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Skye Orthobiologics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan D Saba