This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:26:02 (UTC).

Bankston v. USA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence case was filed by Bankston against USA in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00665

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kimberly Renee Bankston

Respondent

USA

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 4:17-CR-197-O) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Kristina Marie Williams-DOJ added as AUSA. (Williams-DOJ, Kristina) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#3

(#3) Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Leigha A Simonton-DOJ for USA added. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/5/2019) (skg) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Kristina Marie Williams-DOJ added as AUSA. (Williams-DOJ, Kristina) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Sep 5 15:48:44 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Leigha A Simonton-DOJ for USA added. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/5/2019) (skg) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Mon Aug 26 11:11:16 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. (wxc) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 4:17-CR-197-O) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less