This case was last updated from PACER on 06/28/2021 at 09:35:28 (UTC).

Banks v. Royer et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 Banks filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Royer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher C. Conner and CA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00777

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher C. Conner

Referral Judge

CA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Frederick Banks

White Deer, PA 17887

Respondents

Lt. A. Stover

Federal Bureau of Prisons

M. Royer

Warden M. Thompson

CIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Tamara J Haken

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

228 Walnut Street, Suite 220, P.O. Box 11754

Harrisburg, PA 17108

Joseph J Terz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

228 Walnut St, Room 217, Federal Building

Harrisburg, PA 17108

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) TRAVERSE filed by Frederick Banks to Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus #8 . (ibr) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Stay Transfer & for Release, filed by Frederick Banks.(rw) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

8 #2

Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 (Declaration of Erin Frymoyer) with Attachs. A-H

8 #1

Unpublished Opinion(s)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Warden M. Thompson by Warden M. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s), #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 (Declaration of Erin Frymoyer) with Attachs. A-H)(Haken, Tamara) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#7

(#7) SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Habeas Corpus Served on US Attorney. (mw) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #2 ) for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The habeas petition (Doc. 1) is DEEMED filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the petition (Doc. 1) and this order on the respondent. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/18/2021. (mw) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Superintendent and petitioner. Signed by LP on 04/29/2021. (lp) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

3 #1

Notice of Consent

#3

(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frederick Banks.(lp) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

1 #1

Attachments

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Frederick Banks. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(lp) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TRAVERSE filed by Frederick Banks to Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus #8 . (ibr) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Stay Transfer & for Release, filed by Frederick Banks.(rw) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Warden M. Thompson by Warden M. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s), #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 (Declaration of Erin Frymoyer) with Attachs. A-H)(Haken, Tamara) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Habeas Corpus Served on US Attorney. (mw) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #2 ) for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The habeas petition (Doc. 1) is DEEMED filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the petition (Doc. 1) and this order on the respondent. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/18/2021. (mw) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement obo Frederick Banks., signed by C. Gummo, TFPS (sm) Modified on 5/13/2021 (lp). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Superintendent and petitioner. Signed by LP on 04/29/2021. (lp) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frederick Banks.(lp) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Frederick Banks. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(lp) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIA is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Prisons is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tamara J Haken

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph J Terz