This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2021 at 10:21:31 (UTC).

Banks et al v. Helena Marine Service Inc

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 Banks filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Helena Marine Service Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00045

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melvin Banks

Janet Banks

Defendant

Helena Marine Service Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David L. Bateman

Attorney at Bateman Law Firm

6700 Jefferson Highway, Building 3

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Paul Pfeifer

Attorney at Pfeifer Law Firm, P.A.

111 Center Street, Suite 1200

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Cotten Cunningham

Attorney at Barber Law Firm PLLC

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3400

Little Rock, AR 72201

Mark Evan Stallings

Attorney at Barber Law Firm PLLC

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3400

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Exhibit

#8

#9

#10

10 #1

Exhibit

#12

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pfeifer, Paul) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 motion for leave to file.Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/10/2021.(gmh) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 MOTION for Leave to File. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #9 Response to Motion to Remand. (jak) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to File Reply to #9 Response to Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pfeifer, Paul) (Docket text modified on 6/9/2021 to establish linkage) (jak) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Stallings, Mark) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Evan Stallings on behalf of All Defendants (Stallings, Mark) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docket(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge Brian S. Miller. Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/28/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pfeifer, Paul) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs (Pfeifer, Paul) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/7/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/20/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/24/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/17/2021. (ljb) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Helena Marine Service Inc. (llg) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Bateman. Signed by Circuit Judge on 04/01/2021. (llg) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Helena Marine Service Inc filed by Melvin Banks and Janet Banks. (llg) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Helena Marine Service Inc from Phillips County Circuit Court, Case Number 54CV-21-31. Fee of $402 paid, receipt #LIT081878. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Gerard Pfeifer(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L. Bateman