This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:09:03 (UTC).

BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY v. ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01052

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chad E. Kurtz

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR

1200 Nineteenth Street, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036

Mark E. Opalisky

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY.(Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019 (Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark E. Opaliksy, :Firm- Cozen O'Connor, :Address- 1650 Market Street, Suite 2800, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Phone No. - (215) 665-2729. Fax No. - (215) 701-2429 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6059699. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

RESTRICTED

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6059465) filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

1 #2

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- William M. Royston ; Letter to the Court This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file denied See Local Rules 5.1, 5.2". Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/8/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019 (Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave of Mark E. Opalisky to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/18/19. (DMK) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY.(Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark E. Opaliksy, :Firm- Cozen O'Connor, :Address- 1650 Market Street, Suite 2800, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Phone No. - (215) 665-2729. Fax No. - (215) 701-2429 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6059699. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6059465) filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.