This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:28:15 (UTC).

Bank OZK v. Hulsey et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Bank OZK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hulsey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00150

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank OZK

Defendants

James Michael Hulsey

Brunswick, GA 31525

Stephen Derrick Hulsey

Brunswick, GA 31523

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M. Wolfson

Attorney at David M. Wolfson, PC

1010 Williams St.

Valdosta, GA 31603-1448

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Notice of Restriction of Discovery Related Documents re 10 Certificate of Service (MG). Modified on 1/10/2020 (MG). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

9 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Stephen Derrick Hulsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

8 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by James Michael Hulsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank OZK. James Michael Hulsey served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Wolfson, David) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Stephen Derrick Hulsey. (MG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to James Michael Hulsey. (MG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Bank OZK. (Wolfson, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Demand

1 #4

Exhibit Change Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit Deed

1 #2

Exhibit Note

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bank OZK. Fee paid: Receipt #113J-2737234, $400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignment, #2 Exhibit Note, #3 Exhibit Deed, #4 Exhibit Change Agreement, #5 Exhibit Demand, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (MG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Restriction of Discovery Related Documents re 10 Certificate of Service (MG). Modified on 1/10/2020 (MG). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Stephen Derrick Hulsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by James Michael Hulsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank OZK. Stephen Derrick Hulsey served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Wolfson, David) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank OZK. James Michael Hulsey served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Wolfson, David) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Stephen Derrick Hulsey. (MG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to James Michael Hulsey. (MG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Bank OZK. (Wolfson, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/6/2019. (MG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bank OZK. Fee paid: Receipt #113J-2737234, $400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignment, #2 Exhibit Note, #3 Exhibit Deed, #4 Exhibit Change Agreement, #5 Exhibit Demand, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (MG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.