This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 09:35:34 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11 v. KELLEY et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KELLEY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are LANCE E. WALKER and JOHN C. NIVISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LANCE E. WALKER

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11

Defendants

MICHAEL T KELLEY

DIANE E KELLEY

Interested Parties

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 303C

Beverly, MA 01915

Interested Party Attorney

ASHLEY E. EILER

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

100 Middle Street Plaza

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC served on 1/27/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. DIANE E KELLEY served on 2/2/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. MICHAEL T KELLEY served on 2/2/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 1/18/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(EILER, ASHLEY) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

3 #3

Internal Revenue Service summons

1 #10

Exhibit J Affidavit Relating to Military Search

1 #9

Exhibit I Demand Letter

1 #8

Exhibit H 2018 Loan Modification

1 #7

Exhibit G 2013 Loan Modification

1 #6

Exhibit F- Assignment into Bank of New York Mellon

1 #5

Exhibit E Ratification of Assignment into The Bank of New York

1 #4

Exhibit D Assignment into Bank of New York

1 #3

Exhibit C Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B Note

1 #1

Exhibit A Legal Description

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DIANE E KELLEY, MICHAEL T KELLEY PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. (Service of Process Deadline 4/11/2022) Fee due by 1/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Bank of New York, #5 Exhibit E Ratification of Assignment into The Bank of New York, #6 Exhibit F- Assignment into Bank of New York Mellon, #7 Exhibit G 2013 Loan Modification, #8 Exhibit H 2018 Loan Modification, #9 Exhibit I Demand Letter, #10 Exhibit J Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to DIANE E KELLEY, MICHAEL T KELLEY and FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC on 3/28/2022. (mmy) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC served on 1/27/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to DIANE E KELLEY and MICHAEL T KELLEY on 3/28/2022. (mmy) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for MICHAEL T KELLEY and DIANE E KELLEY: Answer due by 2/23/2022. (mmy) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. DIANE E KELLEY served on 2/2/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. MICHAEL T KELLEY served on 2/2/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 1/18/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(EILER, ASHLEY) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2601376.), filed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11.(LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/18/2022. (bfa) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, DIANE E KELLEY, MICHAEL T KELLEY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Diane E Kelley summons, #2 Ford Motor Credit summons, #3 Internal Revenue Service summons)(bfa) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DIANE E KELLEY, MICHAEL T KELLEY PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-11. (Service of Process Deadline 4/11/2022) Fee due by 1/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Bank of New York, #5 Exhibit E Ratification of Assignment into The Bank of New York, #6 Exhibit F- Assignment into Bank of New York Mellon, #7 Exhibit G 2013 Loan Modification, #8 Exhibit H 2018 Loan Modification, #9 Exhibit I Demand Letter, #10 Exhibit J Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHLEY E. EILER