This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2021 at 07:20:08 (UTC).

Bank of Louisiana et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2021 Bank of Louisiana filed an Other lawsuit against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Martin L.C. Feldman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01247

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Martin L.C. Feldman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bank of Louisiana

Sharry R Scott

G. Harrison Scott

New Orleans, LA 70130

Johnny C Crow

Defendants

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Christopher B McNeil

C. Richard Miserendino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Harrison Scott

Attorney at Bank of Louisiana

300 St. Charles Ave.

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that actions 21-779, 21-1247, and 21-1248 are CONSOLIDATED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Any attorney who files a future action relating to controversies already litigated in the cases described in this Order will be sanctioned in accordance with 28:1927 and referred for disciplinary proceedings. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/13/2021. (Reference: 21-779, 21-1247, 21-1248) (sa) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Greg Gerard Guidry, Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 06/28/2021. (NEF: Sect. F, Mag. 1)(ko) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Christopher B McNeil, C. Richard Miserendino. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(bw) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

1 #12

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8921281) filed by Bank of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)Attorney George Harrison Scott added to party Bank of Louisiana(pty:pla).(Scott, George) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/28/2021) (bw). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/28/2021) (bw). (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/28/2021) (bw). (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/28/2021) (bw). (Attachment 6 replaced on 6/28/2021) (bw). (Entered: 06/26/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that actions 21-779, 21-1247, and 21-1248 are CONSOLIDATED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Any attorney who files a future action relating to controversies already litigated in the cases described in this Order will be sanctioned in accordance with 28:1927 and referred for disciplinary proceedings. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/13/2021. (Reference: 21-779, 21-1247, 21-1248) (sa) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Greg Gerard Guidry, Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 06/28/2021. (NEF: Sect. F, Mag. 1)(ko) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (bw) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Christopher B McNeil, C. Richard Miserendino. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(bw) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8921281) filed by Bank of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)Attorney George Harrison Scott added to party Bank of Louisiana(pty:pla).(Scott, George) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/28/2021) (bw). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/28/2021) (bw). (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/28/2021) (bw). (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/28/2021) (bw). (Attachment 6 replaced on 6/28/2021) (bw). (Entered: 06/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of Louisiana is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation is a litigant