This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2021 at 08:48:19 (UTC).

Bank of Commerce v. Equity Bank

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Bank of Commerce filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Equity Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Christine D Little. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00557

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Christine D Little

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Bank of Commerce

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Equity Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John Jay Carwile

Attorney at Baum Glass Jayne Carwile & Peters, PLLC

401 S. Boston Ave., Ste. 2000

Tulsa, OK 74103

Tara Dawn Zickefoose

Attorney at Baum Glass Jayne Carwile & Peters

401 S. Boston Ave., Suite 2000

Tulsa, OK 74103

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Casey Cooper

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals (Tulsa)

100 W 5Th St Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103-4217

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Participation Agreement

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#13

13 #1

Exhibit 1 - Loan Agreement

#14

#16

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: 15 Counterclaim ) by Bank of Commerce (Carwile, John) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this document contains two events and that cannot be properly processed in CM/ECF; Correction: efiled Counterclaim - see 15 (Re: #13 Answer ) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) COUNTERCLAIM against Bank of Commerce (submitted as part of #13 by Equity Bank (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/15/2021) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Equity Bank (With attachments) (Cooper, Casey) Modified on 12/16/2020; this document contains two events and that cannot be properly processed in CM/ECF - see 15 for Counterclaim (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Equity Bank to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the joint motion #10 is granted. Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed no later than 12/15/2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 12/15/2020); granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Equity Bank (Cooper, Casey) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Equity Bancshares, Inc. for Equity Bank) by Equity Bank (Cooper, Casey) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Casey Cooper on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Casey Cooper added to party Equity Bank(pty:dft).] (Cooper, Casey) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent COMMERCE BANCSHARES, INC. for Bank of Commerce) by Bank of Commerce (Carwile, John) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Equity Bank (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bank of Commerce (Carwile, John) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Bank of Commerce to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Equity Bank (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Jay Carwile on behalf of Bank of Commerce (Carwile, John) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Equity Bank (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2294165) by Bank of Commerce (With attachments) (Carwile, John) Modified on 11/3/2020 to correct "against" party (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bank of Commerce (Carwile, John) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of Commerce is a litigant