This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:13:06 (UTC).

OPENED IN ERROR

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 OPENED IN ERROR was filed as a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and John F. Robbenhaar. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00759

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Fashing

Referral Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Bank of America N.A.

Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC

Unknown Persons

Defendants

Yadwinder Singh

Bay Area Hyrovac, LLC

Bay Area Concrete, LLC

PMK Contractors LLC

Preet Johal

Kevin Singh

Unknown Persons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francis Jude Torrence

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #3

Summons

2 #4

Summons

#3

#5

#6

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

7 #1

*Restricted*

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketJudge Unassigned. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to case. (arp) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#8) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-06187. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (arp) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Bay Area Concrete, LLC, Bay Area Hyrovac, LLC, Preet Johal, PMK Contractors LLC, Yadwinder Singh. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/25/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Bank off America N.A. a National banking association, and Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC a Delaware limited liability Company identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America for Bank off America N.A. a National banking association, and Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC a Delaware limited liability Company. (Torrence, Francis) (Filed on 8/11/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Torrence, Francis) (Filed on 8/11/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bay Area Concrete, LLC, Bay Area Hyrovac, LLC, PMK Contractors LLC, Preet Johal, Yadwinder Singh (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16273295). Filed by Bank of America N.A., and Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Torrence, Francis) (Filed on 8/11/2021) Modified on 8/12/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMK CONTRACTORS, LLC., a California limited liability corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BAY AREA CONCRETES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant