This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2023 at 02:59:43 (UTC).

Bandspeed LLC v. Renesas Electronics Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Bandspeed LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Renesas Electronics Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00614

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bandspeed LLC

Defendants

Renesas Electronics Corporation

Renesas Electronics America Inc.

Dialog Semiconductor B.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher V. Goodpastor

Gabriel R. Gervey

Adam G. Price

Defendant Attorneys

Jason A. Crotty

Steven Chase Callahan

Christopher T. Bovenkamp

Jason R. Bartlett

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) SCHEDULING ORDER, ( Tutorial set for 9/19/2023 at 09:30 AM and Markman Hearing Immediately Following before Judge Lee Yeakel,). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#32

RESTRICTED

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher T. Bovenkamp on behalf of Dialog Semiconductor B.V., Renesas Electronics America Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation. Attorney Christopher T. Bovenkamp added to party Dialog Semiconductor B.V.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher T. Bovenkamp added to party Renesas Electronics America Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher T. Bovenkamp added to party Renesas Electronics Corporation(pty:dft) (Bovenkamp, Christopher) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#30

(#30) ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #25 Defendants' Counterclaims ; Bandspeed LLC answer due 3/6/2023. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (pg) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

29 #1

Proposed Order

29 #29

Main Document

#28

(#28) ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

26 #1

Proposed Order

26 #26

Main Document

#25

(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dialog Semiconductor B.V., Renesas Electronics America Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation.(Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#7

(#7) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Dialog Semiconductor B.V., Renesas Electronics America Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation. (dl) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabriel R. Gervey on behalf of Bandspeed LLC. Attorney Gabriel R. Gervey added to party Bandspeed LLC(pty:pla) (Gervey, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher V. Goodpastor on behalf of Bandspeed LLC. Attorney Christopher V. Goodpastor added to party Bandspeed LLC(pty:pla) (Goodpastor, Christopher) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bandspeed LLC. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#24) ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint ; Dialog Semiconductor B.V. answer due 11/28/2022; Renesas Electronics America Inc. answer due 11/28/2022; Renesas Electronics Corporation answer due 11/28/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SCHEDULING ORDER, ( Tutorial set for 9/19/2023 at 09:30 AM and Markman Hearing Immediately Following before Judge Lee Yeakel,). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/3/2023. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(dm) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher T. Bovenkamp on behalf of Dialog Semiconductor B.V., Renesas Electronics America Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation. Attorney Christopher T. Bovenkamp added to party Dialog Semiconductor B.V.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher T. Bovenkamp added to party Renesas Electronics America Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher T. Bovenkamp added to party Renesas Electronics Corporation(pty:dft) (Bovenkamp, Christopher) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #25 Defendants' Counterclaims ; Bandspeed LLC answer due 3/6/2023. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (pg) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #25 Defendants' Counterclaims by Bandspeed LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER, ( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel,), ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #25 Defendants' Counterclaims by Bandspeed LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dialog Semiconductor B.V., Renesas Electronics America Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation.(Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint ; Dialog Semiconductor B.V. answer due 11/28/2022; Renesas Electronics America Inc. answer due 11/28/2022; Renesas Electronics Corporation answer due 11/28/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Dialog Semiconductor B.V., Renesas Electronics America Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation. (dl) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bandspeed LLC. (dl) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (dl) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabriel R. Gervey on behalf of Bandspeed LLC. Attorney Gabriel R. Gervey added to party Bandspeed LLC(pty:pla) (Gervey, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher V. Goodpastor on behalf of Bandspeed LLC. Attorney Christopher V. Goodpastor added to party Bandspeed LLC(pty:pla) (Goodpastor, Christopher) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bandspeed LLC. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16177917), filed by Bandspeed LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less