This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2019 at 08:11:28 (UTC).

Bandspeed LLC v. Cypress Semiconductor Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Bandspeed LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00936

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bandspeed LLC

Defendant

Cypress Semiconductor Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam G. Price

Attorney at DiNovo Price LLP

7000 North Mopac Expressway, Suite 350

Austin, TX 78731

Gabriel R. Gervey

Attorney at DiNovo Price LLP

7000 N. Mopac Expressway, Suite 350

Austin, TX 78731

Christopher V. Goodpastor

Attorney at DiNovo Price LLP

7000 N Mopac Expy, Suite 350

Austin, TX 78731

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Hoffman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 810

Austin, TX 78701

David S. Morris

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, Ste 810

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Cypress Semiconductor Corporation answer due 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party Cypress Semiconductor Corporation(pty:dft) (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bandspeed LLC. Cypress Semiconductor Corporation served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (lt) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (lt) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bandspeed LLC. (Price, Adam) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/24/2019 to flatten form) (lt). Modified on 9/24/2019 (lt). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12639331), filed by Bandspeed LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Cypress Semiconductor Corporation answer due 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party Cypress Semiconductor Corporation(pty:dft) (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bandspeed LLC. Cypress Semiconductor Corporation served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (lt) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (lt) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (lt) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lt) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bandspeed LLC. (Price, Adam) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/24/2019 to flatten form) (lt). Modified on 9/24/2019 (lt). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12639331), filed by Bandspeed LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bandspeed LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Semiconductor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Scott Morris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Hoffman