This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2021 at 09:05:40 (UTC).

Bander v. American Express Company

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Bander filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against American Express Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Daniel C. Irick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01126

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michal Bander

Defendant

American Express Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Octavio Gomez

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

One Tampa City Center Ste 700, 201 N Franklin Street

Tampa, FL 33602-5157

Defendant Attorney

Brian C. Frontino

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3100

Miami, FL 33131-5323

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by American Express Company. (Frontino, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by American Express Company. (Frontino, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#9

(#9) RETURN of service executed on July 21, 2021 by Michal Bander as to American Express Company. (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Michal Bander. (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michal Bander. Related case(s): No (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/8/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to American Express Company. (KNC) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

1 #2

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons as to American Express Company

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against American Express Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18446601) filed by Michal Bander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to American Express Company)(Gomez, Octavio) Modified on 7/8/2021 (removed duplicate language) (KNC). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 9/8/2021, Defendant shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/25/2021. (Irick, Daniel) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by American Express Company. (Frontino, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketReset deadlines: for American Express Company. Response to Complaint due on or before 8/25/2021. (KNC) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 8/25/2021, Defendant shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/11/2021. (Irick, Daniel) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by American Express Company. (Frontino, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of service executed on July 21, 2021 by Michal Bander as to American Express Company. (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Remark: Doc. #6 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/15/2021. (EJV) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Michal Bander. (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michal Bander. Related case(s): No (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/8/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to American Express Company. (KNC) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-1126-RBD-DCI. (SJB) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Express Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18446601) filed by Michal Bander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to American Express Company)(Gomez, Octavio) Modified on 7/8/2021 (removed duplicate language) (KNC). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant