This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2023 at 16:30:03 (UTC).

Bamidele v. Andrade et. al.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Bamidele filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Andrade. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne Y. Shields and Denis R. Hurley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02479

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anne Y. Shields

Presiding Judge

Denis R. Hurley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Damola Bamidele

Defendants

Lily Transportation Corp.

Jery A. Andrade

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph B. Viener

Phyllis L. Sanders

Defendant Attorney

Keith A. Raven

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

#6

(#6) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields.The parties are directed to call the ATTteleconferencing center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code9005911 when prompted. See Order and Attachments. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules, #2 Joint Letter Requirements) (Torres, Jasmine) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

6 #1

AYS Rules

6 #2

Joint Letter Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter Joint Letter to Mag. Shields with Discovery Plan Worksheet by Jery A. Andrade, Lily Transportation Corp. (Raven, Keith) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields.The parties are directed to call the ATTteleconferencing center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code9005911 when prompted. See Order and Attachments. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules, #2 Joint Letter Requirements) (Torres, Jasmine) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal by Jery A. Andrade, Lily Transportation Corp. (Raven, Keith) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lily Transportation Corp. (Raven, Keith) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jery A. Andrade, Lily Transportation Corp. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 611968/2020. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14437538) (Raven, Keith) Modified on 5/6/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less