This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/01/2021 at 07:02:30 (UTC).

Bamforth v. Facebook, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 Bamforth filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Facebook, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-09483

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew David Bamforth

Walnut, CA 91789

Defendants

Facebook, Inc.

Mark Zuckerberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Angela Lucille Dunning

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Colette Ani Ghazarian

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1333 2Nd Street, Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Bobby A. Ghajar

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1333 2Nd Street, Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Letter Re: His Mailing Address from Andrew Bamforth. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE re correct address by Andrew David Bamforth (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: March 31, 2021 CMC vacated per Docket No. #24 . (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #22 Stipulation [as modified by the court]. The March 31, 2021 CMC is vacated and will be reset by the court at a later date. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re #22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg and Andrew David Bamforth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Dunning, #2 Proposed Order)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 2/5/2021) Modified on 2/8/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re #16 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Ghajar, Bobby) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Request for Judicial Notice re #17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Ghajar, Bobby) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Ghajar, Bobby) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Declaration of Angela L. Dunning in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Ghajar, Bobby) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re #7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 6 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 1/5/2021) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Filing Corrected Proof of Service by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re #3 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Notice (Other), #4 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 1/4/2021) Modified on 1/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/14/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Service Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action to the United States District Court (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 12/31/2020) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re #1 Notice of Removal, (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 12/31/2020) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Angela L. Dunning, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 12/31/2020) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 12/31/2020) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of State Court Civil Action from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is 20-CIV-04375. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15386133). Filed byFacebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 12/31/2020) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bobby A. Ghajar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angela Lucille Dunning