Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 05:08:47 (UTC).

Baltas v. Clarke et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Baltas filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Clarke. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert S. Ballou and Michael F. Urbanski. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00276

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert S. Ballou

Presiding Judge

Michael F. Urbanski

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Baltas

Pound, VA 24279

Defendants

Francis Stanley

Harold W. Clarke

A Mullins

S. Jessee

Correctional Officer B. Meade

Shannon Fuller

Lieutenant S. Franklin

Jeffrey B. Kiser

Rollin Cook

Little

S. Anderson

Ms. Allen

James Lambere

J. Looney

L. Mullins

Eric Miller

J. Minigrese

Deborah Ball

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Joe Baltas (slt)

#22

(#22) NOTICE by Joe Baltas regarding prison trust account records. (slt)

#21

(#21) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 6/9/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

#20

(#20) Reply re #14 Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed,,. filed by Joe Baltas. (slt)

#19

(#19) Objections to Consent to Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Joe Baltas (slt)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Joe Baltas. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt)

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) Declaration of Indigency by Joe Baltas (slt)

#14

(#14) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 5/12/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

2 #13

Exhibit 14

2 #8

Exhibit 9

#2

(#2) EXHIBIT 1 by Joe Baltas.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Joe Baltas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14)(lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

1 #5

Prisoner Data Report

1 #4

Envelope

1 #3

Letter

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Part 2

#1

(#2) EXHIBIT 1 by Joe Baltas.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Joe Baltas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14)(lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Joe Baltas (slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE by Joe Baltas regarding prison trust account records. (slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 6/9/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Reply re #14 Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed,,. filed by Joe Baltas. (slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Objections to Consent to Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Joe Baltas (slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Joe Baltas. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joe Baltas. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Declaration of Indigency by Joe Baltas (slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete-missing October and November) and statement of Assets by Joe Baltas (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets, #2 Confirmation of Copies, #3 Cover Letter) (Clerk sending docket sheet.)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 5/12/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter to the Court re: Copy Request by Joe Baltas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lcre, )(c/s) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Acknowledgment of Receipt. (lcre, )(c/s) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Declaration in Support of re #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Joe Baltas. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Under Seal AFFIDAVIT by Joe Baltas. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Memorandum in Support re #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Joe Baltas. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Joe Baltas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Seal by Joe Baltas. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joe Baltas. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT 1 by Joe Baltas.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Joe Baltas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14)(lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Part 1 against Allen, S. Anderson, Deborah Ball, Harold W. Clarke, Rollin Cook, S. Franklin, Shannon Fuller, S. Jessee, Jeffrey B. Kiser, James Lambere, Little, J. Looney, B. Meade, Eric Miller, J. Minigrese, A. Mullins, L. Mullins, Francis Stanley, filed by Joe Baltas. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope, #5 Prisoner Data Report)(lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ms. Allen is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. LITTLE is a litigant